Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0169016

EP0169016 - Polypeptide cartilage-inducing factors found in bone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CELTRIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
2500 Faber Place Palo Alto
CA 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/32]For all designated states
CELTRIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
2500 Faber Place
Palo Alto CA 94303 / US
Former [1991/48]For all designated states
CELTRIX LABORATORIES, INC.
2500 Faber Place
Palo Alto CA 94303 / US
Former [1989/35]For all designated states
COLLAGEN CORPORATION (a Delaware corporation)
2500 Faber Place
Palo Alto California 94303 / US
Former [1986/04]For all designated states
COLLAGEN CORPORATION
2500 Faber Place
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Seyedin, Saeid
645 Cheshire Way
Sunnyvale California 94087 / US
02 / Thomas, Thomas
3000 Cowell Boulevard, No. 275
Davis California 95616 / US
[1986/04]
Representative(s)Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/31]Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [1994/28]Harrison, David Christopher , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1986/04]Harrison, David Christopher
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date85304848.608.07.1985
[1986/04]
Priority number, dateUS1984063093816.07.1984         Original published format: US 630938
[1986/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0169016
Date:22.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0169016
Date:29.04.1987
Language:EN
[1987/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0169016
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0169016
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.1987
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/495, A61K38/18, A61L27/22
[2004/01]
Former International [1995/40]C07K14/00, A61K38/00, A61L27/00
Former International [1986/04]C07K13/00, A61K37/02, A61L27/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/04]
TitleGerman:Knorpel-induzierende Polypeptid-Faktoren aus Knochen[2004/01]
English:Polypeptide cartilage-inducing factors found in bone[1986/04]
French:Facteur polypeptidique issu des os induisant le cartilage[2004/01]
Former [1986/04]Polypeptide induzierende Faktoren in Knochen und Knorpel
Former [1986/04]Facteur induisant le polypeptide cartilage dans les os
Examination procedure14.08.1987Examination requested  [1987/42]
05.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
28.08.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
23.03.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1990Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
18.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
30.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.1995Fee for grant paid
02.05.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination29.11.1990Appeal received No.  T0184/91
25.01.1991Statement of grounds filed
14.01.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/03]
23.03.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/13]
11.06.1993Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.07.1996   
Novartis AG Patent and Trademark Dept.
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
 02  03.07.1996   
OSI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
106 Charles Lindberg Blvd
Uniondale, New York 11553-3649 / US
Opponents representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [1998/20]
Opponent(s)01  02.07.1996   
Novartis AG Patent and Trademark Dept.
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
 02  03.07.1996   
OSI Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
106 Charles Lindberg Blvd
Uniondale, New York 11553-3649 / US
Opponents representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [1997/16]
Opponent(s)01  02.07.1996   
Novartis AG Patent and Trademark Dept.
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
 02  03.07.1996   
Oncogene Science, Inc.
106 Charles Lindberg Blvd Uniondale
New York 11553-3649 / US
Opponents representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [1996/34]
Opponent(s)01  02.07.1996   
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 BASEL / CH
 02  03.07.1996   
Oncogene Science, Inc.
106 Charles Lindberg Blvd Uniondale
New York 11553-3649 / US
Opponents representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
12.08.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.05.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.07.1998Date of oral proceedings
28.08.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.10.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.05.2001Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
15.07.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.07.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.02.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition04.12.1998Appeal received No.  T1147/98
17.02.1999Statement of grounds filed
14.07.2000Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
17.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
09.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 08
12.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 09
07.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 10
11.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.1995
[2005/11]
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4434094  ;
 [Y]US4440750  ;
 [YD]WO8401106  ;
 [E]EP0182483
 [Y]  - PROCEEDNGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 80, November 1983, pages 6591-6595, National Academy of sciences of the USA, Washington, D.C., US; T.K.SAMPATH et al.: " Homology of bone-inductive proteins from human, monkey, bovine, and rat extracellular matrix"
 [T]  - NATURE, vol. 316, 22nd August 1985, pages 701-705, Macmillan Journals Ltd, London, GB; R.DERYNCK et al.: " Human transforming growth factor-beta complementary DNA sequence and expression in normal and transformed cells"