Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0169016 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0169016



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1535
22.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.03.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 3
25.02.2004 Claims Opposition 2
25.02.2004 Claims Opposition 2
25.02.2004 Claims Opposition 2
25.02.2004 Claims Opposition 2
25.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
13.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
13.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
13.11.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
13.11.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Appeal 1
13.11.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
13.11.2003 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
13.11.2003 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
13.11.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
13.11.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
10.11.2003 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
31.07.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.07.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 2
15.07.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.07.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 18
28.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.05.2001 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
15.05.2001 Claims Opposition 2
15.05.2001 Claims Opposition 2
15.05.2001 Description Opposition 9
15.05.2001 Drawings Opposition 6
15.05.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 21
16.01.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
16.01.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.12.2000 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
19.10.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.10.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.10.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
14.07.2000 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
05.11.1999 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 2
04.11.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
04.11.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
01.11.1999 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
13.09.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.09.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
13.09.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.09.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
30.06.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
30.06.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
30.06.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.06.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
15.04.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
15.04.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
10.03.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
10.03.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.03.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
10.03.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
10.03.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
10.03.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
26.02.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.02.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.02.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.02.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 39
01.02.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.01.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
18.01.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.12.1998 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
04.12.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
16.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.11.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.11.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.10.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.10.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.10.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.10.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.10.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
08.10.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
08.10.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
08.10.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
08.10.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
08.10.1998 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.10.1998 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.10.1998 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.10.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 16
28.08.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
28.08.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
28.08.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
28.08.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
28.08.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
28.08.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
28.08.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
28.08.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
25.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Authorisation of representative Opposition 3
17.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Claims Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Claims Opposition 2
17.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
15.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
13.07.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
13.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.07.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.07.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
09.07.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
25.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.06.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
12.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.06.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
27.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.05.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.05.1998 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.05.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
27.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
22.05.1998 Claims Opposition 2
22.05.1998 Claims Opposition 2
22.05.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 19
20.05.1998 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
20.05.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.05.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
20.05.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 30
19.05.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
11.05.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.05.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.05.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
06.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.04.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.04.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.03.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.03.1998 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
28.03.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.03.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.03.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
24.03.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
24.03.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
24.03.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.03.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
12.03.1998 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
05.03.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.02.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
24.02.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
15.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
15.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
15.05.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
15.05.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
21.04.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.04.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.04.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.04.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.02.1997 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
25.02.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.02.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.02.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
05.02.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.01.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.12.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.12.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.08.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.08.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.08.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.08.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
23.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
11.07.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.07.1996 N/A Opposition 1
11.07.1996 N/A Opposition 1
04.07.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
04.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
04.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
04.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
03.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.07.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
03.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
03.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
03.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
03.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
03.07.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
02.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.07.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
27.02.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.02.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.08.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.07.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
11.07.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.07.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.07.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.07.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.04.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
28.03.1995 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.12.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.12.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
25.11.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
31.08.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
31.08.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
31.08.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
31.08.1994 Claims Search / examination 3
31.08.1994 Description Search / examination 1
31.08.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
20.07.1994 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 4
31.01.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.1994 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.1994 Description Search / examination 5
31.01.1994 Description Search / examination 1
31.01.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.01.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
28.01.1994 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
27.01.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
04.01.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.07.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.06.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 9
09.06.1993 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
09.06.1993 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
08.06.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.05.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
12.05.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
07.05.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
24.03.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
26.01.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
14.01.1993 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 2
05.01.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.12.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.11.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 2
20.11.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
20.11.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.11.1992 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 11
23.06.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
11.06.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
11.06.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.06.1992 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 6
01.06.1992 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.05.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
20.02.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.12.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.11.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.11.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
07.11.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.10.1991 Cover page: Decision (ex parte) Appeal 1
25.10.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 7
25.10.1991 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 9
16.10.1991 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.10.1991 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.09.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.07.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.07.1991 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 2
26.06.1991 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
26.06.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
26.06.1991 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
21.06.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 20
19.04.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.04.1991 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.04.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.04.1991 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.03.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.03.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.03.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.03.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.03.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.03.1991 Note on telephone consultation Appeal 1
25.01.1991 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
29.11.1990 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.10.1990 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.10.1990 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
24.09.1990 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 22
26.05.1990 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
14.05.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
14.05.1990 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.05.1990 Annex Search / examination 1
09.05.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.04.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.04.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
25.04.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.04.1990 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.04.1990 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.03.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.12.1989 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.12.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
14.12.1989 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
14.12.1989 Information concerning the posting of documents in due time Search / examination 1
28.08.1989 Annex Search / examination 6
28.08.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.1989 Description Search / examination 4
28.08.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
28.08.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.07.1989 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.07.1989 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.06.1989 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
16.06.1989 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
16.06.1989 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
18.05.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
13.02.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
13.02.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
13.02.1989 Description Search / examination 1
13.02.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.10.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
14.08.1987 Annex Search / examination 1
14.08.1987 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
07.05.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.03.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.03.1987 European search report Search / examination 3
26.11.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.07.1985 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 4
17.07.1985 Drawings Search / examination 6
17.07.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.07.1985 Priority document Search / examination 31
08.07.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.07.1985 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
08.07.1985 Claims Search / examination 2
08.07.1985 Description Search / examination 18
08.07.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.1985 Drawings Search / examination 6
08.07.1985 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.07.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10