Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0177165 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0177165



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 628
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
18.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.10.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
29.08.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.08.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.08.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.08.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.08.1997 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.1997 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.1997 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.1997 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.1997 Claims Appeal 2
26.08.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
26.08.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.08.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
25.08.1997 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
25.08.1997 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
22.08.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.08.1997 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
19.08.1997 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
18.08.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
06.08.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
06.08.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
06.08.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
30.07.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
03.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
06.06.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.06.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.06.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.06.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
03.06.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
03.06.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
15.05.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.05.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.05.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 30
01.07.1994 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.07.1994 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
01.07.1994 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
24.06.1994 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
21.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.06.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
16.05.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.03.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
24.02.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.02.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.02.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 13
17.02.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.02.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.02.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
19.01.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.01.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.01.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.12.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
10.12.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.10.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.10.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.10.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.10.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.10.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.10.1993 Annex to a communication Opposition 19
08.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
08.10.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.09.1993 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
21.09.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
21.09.1993 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
17.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
17.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.09.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
15.09.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
10.09.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.09.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.09.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
09.09.1993 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
07.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
18.08.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.08.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Claims Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Drawings Opposition 2
12.08.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
12.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
12.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.03.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.03.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.02.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
17.02.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.01.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
26.01.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.12.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
26.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.11.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
02.10.1992 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.07.1992 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
30.07.1992 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
23.07.1992 Claims Opposition 1
23.07.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.06.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.06.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.06.1992 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.06.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.05.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.05.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.05.1992 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
21.01.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.01.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.01.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.12.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.12.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.12.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
05.12.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
03.12.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.11.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.03.1991 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.01.1991 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.09.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.09.1990 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
12.09.1990 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.08.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
30.07.1990 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.04.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.04.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
09.04.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.03.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.03.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.03.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
24.02.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.08.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.08.1985 Claims Search / examination 2
27.08.1985 Description Search / examination 17
27.08.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.1985 Priority document Search / examination 22