Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0181233 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0181233



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 872
20.08.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.08.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.08.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.08.1998 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
20.07.1998 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
20.07.1998 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
20.07.1998 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
30.04.1998 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
30.04.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
30.04.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
27.04.1998 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
21.04.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.04.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.04.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.02.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.02.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.02.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.02.1998 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 30
18.02.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
18.02.1998 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
12.02.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.01.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 16
30.01.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.01.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
07.11.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.10.1997 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
20.09.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
17.09.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.09.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.09.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.09.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.09.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.09.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.08.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.08.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.08.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.05.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.05.1997 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
14.05.1997 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
14.05.1997 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
27.04.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.01.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.12.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 39
08.11.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
17.10.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 8
17.10.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.10.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.10.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.10.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.10.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.10.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.10.1996 Means of redress Opposition 1
17.10.1996 Text intended for grant Opposition 10
14.10.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
12.09.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.07.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.07.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.07.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
27.06.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
26.06.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
26.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
22.04.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.03.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
04.03.1996 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.03.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.02.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
26.02.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
26.02.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
15.02.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
15.02.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
27.12.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.12.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.12.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.12.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.12.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.12.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.12.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.12.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.12.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.10.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.10.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.10.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.10.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.10.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
17.10.1995 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
17.10.1995 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
17.10.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
17.10.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
17.10.1995 Text intended for grant Opposition 11
14.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.09.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
21.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.08.1995 Claims Opposition 3
10.08.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
02.05.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.04.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
24.03.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.03.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.03.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.03.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.03.1995 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
17.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
15.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
16.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.01.1995 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.01.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.01.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
03.01.1995 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 12
14.11.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.10.1994 Request for documents Opposition 1
12.10.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
12.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.09.1994 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Opposition 1
23.09.1994 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
23.09.1994 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
23.09.1994 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
08.09.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 6
08.09.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 9
08.09.1994 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 7
08.09.1994 Observations by third parties Opposition 1
08.09.1994 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 4
08.09.1994 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 12
02.09.1994 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.1994 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
16.03.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
16.03.1994 Claims Opposition 3
16.03.1994 Claims Opposition 3
16.03.1994 Claims Opposition 3
16.03.1994 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
15.03.1994 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
22.12.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.12.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
27.11.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
15.11.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.11.1993 N/A Opposition 1
15.11.1993 N/A Opposition 1
05.11.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.11.1993 Request for documents Opposition 1
31.10.1993 Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition Opposition 1
25.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.10.1993 Request for documents Opposition 1
19.10.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.10.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.10.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.10.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
13.10.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
13.10.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
13.10.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.10.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
12.10.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
03.12.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
08.10.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.10.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.10.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.08.1992 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
15.07.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
14.04.1992 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.04.1992 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.12.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.07.1991 Claims Search / examination 6
26.07.1991 Description Search / examination 28
26.07.1991 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.05.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.05.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.05.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
17.12.1990 Description Search / examination 3
17.12.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.12.1990 Description Search / examination 3
14.12.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
13.08.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.05.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.1990 Description Search / examination 2
23.05.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.02.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
09.02.1990 Description Search / examination 3
09.02.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.12.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.11.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.05.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
17.05.1989 Description Search / examination 1
17.05.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.04.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.03.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.03.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.12.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.11.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
30.09.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.07.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
03.05.1988 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.05.1988 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Request for assignment Search / examination 10
09.11.1987 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.05.1987 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.03.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.03.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
20.03.1987 General enquiry Search / examination 1
02.04.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.11.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.11.1985 Priority document Search / examination 22
08.11.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.11.1985 Claims Search / examination 3
08.11.1985 Description Search / examination 20
08.11.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.1985 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.1985 Priority document Search / examination 19
08.11.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10