Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0188920 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0188920



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1869
15.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
08.12.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
17.07.1999 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
01.07.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.07.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.06.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.06.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.06.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.04.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.04.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.04.1999 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 24
13.04.1999 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
13.04.1999 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
13.04.1999 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
22.03.1999 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
19.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 26
08.01.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.1999 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
24.12.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.12.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.12.1998 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
08.12.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
04.12.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.11.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.10.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.10.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
31.01.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.01.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 10
22.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
03.12.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
03.12.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.11.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.11.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
04.11.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
09.09.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.09.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.09.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.09.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.1996 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
09.07.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.05.1996 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
07.05.1996 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.05.1996 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 16
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.04.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 13
26.04.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
26.04.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
26.04.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 39
24.04.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
29.03.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.03.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.03.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.03.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
18.03.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.02.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
26.02.1996 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.02.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.12.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
18.12.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
18.12.1995 Text intended for grant Opposition 62
08.12.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 13
08.12.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 15
08.12.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
17.10.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.10.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
22.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
15.09.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.09.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 5
25.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.04.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.03.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
30.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
29.03.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
23.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
15.03.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
15.03.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.1995 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.02.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
13.02.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
13.12.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.12.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.12.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
03.08.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.08.1994 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.07.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.07.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.07.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
04.07.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.06.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
28.06.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.06.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
09.03.1994 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.08.1993 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.06.1993 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.06.1993 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.06.1993 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.03.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
10.03.1993 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.02.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
05.02.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 126
19.12.1992 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.08.1992 Annex Search / examination 8
11.08.1992 Claims Search / examination 4
11.08.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.1992 Annex Search / examination 8
10.08.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.08.1992 Annex Search / examination 4
03.08.1992 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.08.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.08.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.08.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.06.1992 Annex Search / examination 2
17.06.1992 Claims Search / examination 4
17.06.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.06.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
19.05.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.05.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.04.1992 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.03.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.09.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
20.08.1991 Claims Search / examination 4
20.08.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.06.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.02.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
28.11.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.11.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.09.1990 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
05.09.1990 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.09.1990 Annex Search / examination 3
03.09.1990 Annex Search / examination 13
03.09.1990 Annex Search / examination 5
03.09.1990 Annex Search / examination 10
03.09.1990 Annex Search / examination 7
03.09.1990 Claims Search / examination 4
03.09.1990 Drawings Search / examination 1
03.09.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 19
03.09.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
25.06.1990 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.03.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.03.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.11.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.06.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
19.06.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.1989 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
02.06.1989 Annex Search / examination 3
02.06.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.04.1989 Claims Search / examination 7
14.04.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
14.04.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
14.04.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.04.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.01.1989 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.12.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
14.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
11.10.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.09.1988 Annex Search / examination 2
29.09.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
12.09.1988 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
08.08.1988 Annex Search / examination 2
08.08.1988 Claims Search / examination 5
08.08.1988 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 4
19.04.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
24.06.1987 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.05.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.03.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.03.1987 European search report Search / examination 4
06.09.1986 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
02.09.1986 General enquiry Search / examination 1
18.06.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.04.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.04.1986 Priority document Search / examination 40
07.04.1986 Priority document Search / examination 71
07.04.1986 Priority document Search / examination 64
07.04.1986 Priority document Search / examination 58
07.04.1986 Priority document Search / examination 54
07.04.1986 Priority document Search / examination 65
07.04.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 46
07.04.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 47
07.04.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 50
07.04.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 42
03.04.1986 Claims Search / examination 6
03.04.1986 Description Search / examination 100
03.04.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.03.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.03.1986 Claims Search / examination 6
27.03.1986 Description Search / examination 100
27.03.1986 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
12.02.1986 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
14.01.1986 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.01.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.12.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.12.1985 Claims Search / examination 6
23.12.1985 Description Search / examination 100
23.12.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.1985 Drawings Search / examination 9
23.12.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10