Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0151069

EP0151069 - Hydraulic power booster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/32]Hydraulic power assisting
[1987/24]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  09.05.1994
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BENDIX France
126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
[1985/40]
Former [1985/32]For all designated states
SOCIETE ANONYME D.B.A.
Centre Paris Pleyel
F-93521 St-Denis Cédex 01 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Sauvée, Jean-Paul
76, Boulevard Félix Faure
F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR
02 / Riquart, Christian
33, rue Fessart
F-75019 Paris / FR
03 / Levrai, Roland
9 bis, Avenue Monmousseau
F-93240 Stains / FR
[1985/32]
Representative(s)Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Novagraaf Technologies
122 Rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/30]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Bendix Europe Service Techniques Service Brevets, 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1988/41]Lejet, Christian
BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Former [1985/32]Timoney, Ian Charles Craig
Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad
F-93700 Drancy / FR
Application number, filing date85400108.823.01.1985
[1985/32]
Priority number, dateFR1984000143931.01.1984         Original published format: FR 8401439
[1985/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0151069
Date:07.08.1985
Language:FR
[1985/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0151069
Date:18.09.1985
Language:FR
[1985/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0151069
Date:10.06.1987
Language:FR
[1987/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.1985
ClassificationInternational:B60T13/12
[1985/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1985/32]
TitleGerman:Hydraulische Verstärkeranlage[1985/32]
English:Hydraulic power booster[1987/24]
French:Dispositif d'assistance hydraulique[1985/32]
Former [1985/32]Hydraulic power assisting
Examination procedure31.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/32]
31.07.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
15.12.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.1987Fee for grant paid
29.01.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.1988  14.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred Teves GmbH
Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20
D-60441 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Grau, Ulf
c/o ALFRED TEVES GMBH Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1988/14]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.1988  14.03.1988  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred Teves GmbH
Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20
D-60441 Frankfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Grau, Ulf
c/o ALFRED TEVES GMBH Guerickestrasse 7
D-60488 Frankfurt / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.04.1988Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.1988Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.07.1988Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
13.09.1988Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.07.1991Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
29.03.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
28.04.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/26]
Appeal following opposition01.10.1991Appeal received No.  T0769/91
04.10.1991Statement of grounds filed
29.03.1994Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
10.01.1990Appeal received No.  T0042/90
08.03.1990Statement of grounds filed
13.09.1990Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/37]
08.10.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/41]
25.02.1991Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
22.10.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/43]
11.11.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/46]
21.09.1989Date of oral proceedings
10.11.1989Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2421329