blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0213250

EP0213250 - Method for connecting members and connection according to said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.03.1988
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.1988Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.1988 [1988/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cole, Stephen
Main Road Goodnight
New South Wales 2739 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1987/11]For all designated states
Cole, Stephen
Main Road
Goodnight New South Wales 2739 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/11]
Representative(s)Waxweiler, Jean, et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1987/11]Waxweiler, Jean, et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
L-1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date85630128.813.08.1985
[1987/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0213250
Date:11.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.1986
ClassificationIPC:B21D39/04, F16B7/00, // A01G9/14
[1987/11]
CPC:
A01G9/1407 (EP); B21D39/044 (EP); F16B7/00 (EP);
F16B7/18 (EP); Y02A40/25 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden von Teilen und Verbindung nach diesem Verfahren[1987/11]
English:Method for connecting members and connection according to said method[1987/11]
French:Procédé pour fixer des pièces et fixation suivant ce procédé[1987/11]
File destroyed:17.08.1994
Examination procedure11.09.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/17]
07.12.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/17]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.09.1987M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.198703   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]NL6404511  ;
 [A]US2881017  (MILLAR JR JOHN);
 [A]US2408907  (BOOTH EARL C);
 [E]AU8538739
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.