blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0157738

EP0157738 - Process for the preparation of nitroxyls of sterically hindered amines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.1990
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.1990 [1990/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1985/41]For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Winter, Roland A. E.
23 Banksville Road
Armonk New York 10504 / US
02 / Malherbe, Roger F., Dr.
Bleichestrasse 7
CH-4058 Basel / CH
[1985/41]
Application number, filing date85810115.718.03.1985
[1985/41]
Priority number, dateUS1984059231722.03.1984         Original published format: US 592317
[1985/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0157738
Date:09.10.1985
Language:DE
[1985/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0157738
Date:19.04.1989
Language:DE
[1989/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.1985
ClassificationIPC:C07B61/02, // C07D211/94, C07D263/04, C07D263/52, C07D241/08, C07D401/04, C07D498/10
[1985/41]
CPC:
C07D263/52 (EP); C07D211/94 (EP); C07D241/08 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Nitroxylen sterisch gehinderter Amine[1985/41]
English:Process for the preparation of nitroxyls of sterically hindered amines[1985/41]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de radicaux nitroxydes d'amines stériquement encombrés[1985/41]
Examination procedure20.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/41]
18.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.09.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1988Fee for grant paid
19.11.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3634346
 [A]  - COLLECTION OF CZECHOSLOVAK CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, Band 46, Nr. 5, 1981, Seiten 1071-1082; V. CHOLVAD et al.: "Hydrogen and electron transfer from diphenylamine in reaction with coordinated peroxy-radicals and hydroperoxides"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.