blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0198838

EP0198838 - A LOAD CARRYING AND TIPPING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.1991
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SWAIN, Hugh David
4 Genesta Crescent
Dalkeith, W.A. 6009 / AU
[1986/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1986/44]
Representative(s)Matthews, Howard Nicholas, et al
Page Hargrave Manfield House 1 Southampton Street
London WC2R 0LR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/47]Matthews, Howard Nicholas, et al
Page Hargrave 2 Tower Street
London WC2H 9NP / GB
Application number, filing date85900594.429.01.1985
[1986/44]
WO1985AU00014
Priority number, dateAU1984000337927.01.1984         Original published format: AU 337984
AU1984000351808.02.1984         Original published format: AU 351884
AU1984000459616.04.1984         Original published format: AU 459684
[1986/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8503264
Date:01.08.1985
Language:EN
[1985/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0198838
Date:29.10.1986
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1986/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0198838
Date:03.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.08.1985
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:B62D63/06, B62D13/04
[1986/44]
CPC:
B60P1/04 (EP,US); E02F3/96 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/44]
TitleGerman:LADUNGSTRANSPORTIERENDES KIPPERFAHRZEUG[1986/44]
English:A LOAD CARRYING AND TIPPING VEHICLE[1986/44]
French:VEHICULE DE TRANSPORT ET DE DEVERSEMENT DE CHARGES[1986/44]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Entry into regional phase24.07.1986National basic fee paid 
24.07.1986Search fee paid 
24.07.1986Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.1986Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.1985Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE
28.07.1986Examination requested  [1986/44]
30.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.1990Fee for grant paid
02.07.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.07.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199006   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.1990
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.10.1990
BE03.10.1990
CH03.10.1990
FR03.10.1990
LI03.10.1990
NL03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
LU31.01.1991
[2006/14]
Former [1999/52]AT03.10.1990
BE03.10.1990
CH03.10.1990
LI03.10.1990
NL03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
LU31.01.1991
FR22.02.1991
Former [1992/18]AT03.10.1990
BE03.10.1990
CH03.10.1990
LI03.10.1990
NL03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
FR22.02.1991
Former [1991/50]AT03.10.1990
BE03.10.1990
NL03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
FR22.02.1991
Former [1991/44]AT03.10.1990
BE03.10.1990
NL03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
Former [1991/42]AT03.10.1990
BE03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
Former [1991/38]BE03.10.1990
SE03.10.1990
Former [1991/27]SE03.10.1990
Documents cited:Search[X]US4105131  (BRODERICK ROSS THOMAS)
International search[X]FR876109  (HEINRICH LANZ AG);
 [Y]GB644455  (HENRY ALFRED HARDING, et al);
 [X]CH315782  (LANKER EMIL [CH]);
 [X]AU5484673  (BURGESS R H);
 [X]AU8346875  (SARGENT INDUSTRIES);
 [Y]AU8669482  (PERLINI R)
 [X]  - D.R. WOODLEY, 'Encyclopaedia of Materials Handling', Volume 1, published 1964, by Pergamon Press (London) see page 602 figure 4.123
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.