blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0177543

EP0177543 - PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT FOR REMOVAL OF SUSPENDED MATERIAL, BIOGENETIC NUTRIENTS AND DISSOLVED METAL COMPOUNDS FROM SEWAGE CONTAMINATED WITH ORGANIC AND/OR INORGANIC SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.1991
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.03.1991 [1991/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIZEPITÖIPARI TRÖSZT
Vaci utca 36
H-1056 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
KÖZPONTI KEMIAI KUTATO INTEZET
Pusztaszeri ut 57
H-1025 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
VIZGAZDALKODASI TUDOMANYOS KUTATO KÖZPONT
Kassai Janos ut 1
H-1095 Budapest / HU
For all designated states
KELETMAGYARORSZAGI VIZÜGYI TERVEZÖ VALLALAT
Sagvari Körut 32
H-5000 Szolnok / HU
[1986/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KISS, Jeno
Kórház ut 27.
H-1035 Budapest / HU
02 / HOSSZU, Adám
Zöldlomb utca 2.
H-1025 Budapest / HU
03 / DEAK, Béla
Guttenberg tér 4.
H-1088 Budapest / HU
04 / KALLO, Dénes
Frankel Leó ut 2-4.
H-1027 Budapest / HU
05 / PAPP, János
Fillér lépcso 2
H-1022 Budapest / HU
06 / MESZAROS, Agnes
Thomán István ut 9/b.
H-1124 Budapest / HU
07 / MUCSY, György
Martinovics tér 8.
H-1105 Budapest / HU
08 / OLAH, József
Eperjes ut 46.
H-1204 Budapest / HU
09 / URBANYI, György
Futórózsa ut 90.
H-1165 Budapest / HU
10 / GAL, Tivadar
Kassai ut 41.
H-5000 Szolnok / HU
11 / APRO, Istvän
Csokonai ut 19.
H-5000 Szolnok / HU
12 / CZEPEK, Gyula
Jászi F. ut 17.
H-5000 Szolnok / HU
13 / TÖRÖCSIK, Ferenc
Ady Endre ut 18.
H-5000 Szolnok / HU
14 / LOVAS, András
Ragó Antal ut 4.
H-5000 Szolnok / HU
[1986/16]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner, et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/16]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date85901544.801.04.1985
[1986/16]
WO1985HU00021
Priority number, dateHU1984000131902.04.1984         Original published format: HU 131984
[1986/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8504390
Date:10.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0177543
Date:16.04.1986
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1986/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0177543
Date:21.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT10.10.1985
ClassificationIPC:C02F1/58, C02F1/42, C02F1/28
[1986/16]
CPC:
C02F3/1215 (EP,US); C02F1/281 (EP,US); C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/586 (EP,US); C02F9/00 (EP,US); C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (EP,US); C02F2101/20 (EP,US); Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG SUSPENDIERTEN MATERIALS, BIOGENETISCHER NÄHRMITTEL UND AUFGELÖSTER METALLVERBINDUNGEN AUS KLÄRWASSER, DAS MIT ORGANISCHEN UND/ODER ANORGANISCHEN SUBSTANZEN VERUNREINIGT IST[1986/16]
English:PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT FOR REMOVAL OF SUSPENDED MATERIAL, BIOGENETIC NUTRIENTS AND DISSOLVED METAL COMPOUNDS FROM SEWAGE CONTAMINATED WITH ORGANIC AND/OR INORGANIC SUBSTANCES[1986/16]
French:PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT PERMETTANT D'EXTRAIRE UN MATERIAU SUSPENDU, DES SUBSTANCES NUTRITIVES BIOGENETIQUES ET DES COMPOSES METALLIQUES DISSOUS A PARTIR D'EAUX D'EGOUTS CONTAMINEES PAR DES SUBSTANCES ORGANIQUES ET/OU INORGANIQUES[1986/16]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1985National basic fee paid 
06.11.1985Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.1986Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.1986Examination requested  [1986/22]
05.06.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.09.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1989Fee for grant paid
01.12.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS3723308  [ ] (BRECK D);
 DE2825879  [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP);
 DE2156471  [ ];
 US4364909  [ ] (LEE JOHN M, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.