Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0211846 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0211846



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 454
20.11.1999 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
07.04.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.10.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.10.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.10.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.09.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.09.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.09.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 26
22.09.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
18.09.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.09.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.08.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
26.08.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.08.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.08.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
06.08.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
04.08.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.08.1997 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 14
28.07.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
03.05.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.04.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.12.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.07.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
27.07.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.07.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.06.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.06.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.05.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.05.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.04.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.04.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.04.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.01.1995 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 4
29.12.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.08.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.08.1994 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
03.08.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.08.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.08.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.08.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
03.08.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
03.08.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
06.07.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.07.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.06.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.06.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.04.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.04.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.04.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.04.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
14.04.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
14.04.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
14.04.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
14.04.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
14.04.1994 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
02.03.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
16.02.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.11.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.11.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.10.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.10.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.10.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
14.10.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
15.09.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.08.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.01.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.12.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
31.12.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
12.09.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
12.09.1991 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
09.04.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.04.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
26.03.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
29.01.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
28.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
22.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.09.1990 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
28.09.1990 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
27.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.04.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.03.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.03.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.03.1990 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
09.01.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.01.1990 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
09.11.1989 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.11.1989 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
07.11.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.11.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.11.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 4
26.10.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.10.1989 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.10.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.10.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.09.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.09.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.09.1989 N/A Opposition 1
23.09.1989 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
19.09.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.09.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.08.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.1989 Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) Opposition 1
26.05.1989 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.05.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.05.1989 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.05.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.05.1989 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.05.1989 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.05.1989 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
09.05.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.05.1989 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.01.1989 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.07.1988 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.05.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
25.04.1988 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
15.04.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.02.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.01.1988 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.01.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.01.1988 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.11.1987 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
04.11.1987 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.10.1987 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.10.1987 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
13.10.1987 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.09.1987 Claims Search / examination 2
30.09.1987 Description Search / examination 3
28.08.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.07.1987 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
15.01.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
04.11.1986 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 2
03.09.1986 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.08.1986 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.08.1986 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24
28.08.1986 Priority document Search / examination 25
12.07.1986 Abstract Search / examination 2
12.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Search / examination 1
12.07.1986 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 Description Search / examination 12
12.07.1986 Description Search / examination 1
12.07.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 Drawings Search / examination 2
12.07.1986 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 3
12.07.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.07.1986 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.07.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
18.06.1985 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
18.06.1985 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1