blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0197048

EP0197048 - UNIVERSAL MEDICAL COVER SHEET AND PROCESS FOR DRAPING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1993
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.1993 [1993/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/42]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARCO, Judith, A.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133 / US
[1986/42]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/42]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date85904551.003.09.1985
[1986/42]
WO1985US01683
Priority number, dateUS1984066168817.10.1984         Original published format: US 661688
[1986/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8602258
Date:24.04.1986
Language:EN
[1986/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0197048
Date:15.10.1986
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1986/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0197048
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.1986
ClassificationIPC:A61B19/08
[1986/42]
CPC:
A61B46/00 (EP,US); A61B2046/205 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/16]
Former [1986/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:ALLGEMEIN VERWENDBARES MEDIZINISCHES ABDECKTUCH UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG[1986/42]
English:UNIVERSAL MEDICAL COVER SHEET AND PROCESS FOR DRAPING[1986/42]
French:COUVERTURE MEDICALE UNIVERSELLE ET PROCEDE DE DRAPAGE[1992/32]
Former [1986/42]FEUILLE DE COUVERTURE MEDICALE UNIVERSELLE ET PROCEDE DE DRAPAGE
Entry into regional phase10.07.1986National basic fee paid 
10.07.1986Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.1986Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1986Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.1986Examination requested  [1986/51]
30.10.1986Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU, NL, SE
23.10.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.02.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.1992Fee for grant paid
25.02.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30]
Request for further processing for:27.06.1991Request for further processing filed
27.06.1991Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.07.1991Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.07.1986AT   M02   Not yet paid
17.07.1986BE   M02   Not yet paid
17.07.1986CH   M02   Not yet paid
17.07.1986LU   M02   Not yet paid
17.07.1986NL   M02   Not yet paid
17.07.1986SE   M02   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS3791381  [ ] (KRZEWINSKI H);
 US3799161  [ ] (COLLINS R);
 US3989040  [ ] (LOFGREN LEWIS C, et al);
 FR2413075  [ ] (SOPLARIL SA [FR]);
 US4397309  [ ] (MCALLESTER SPEARS L)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.