blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0235290

EP0235290 - SELF-CLOSING DOOR SEALING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.1993
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.03.1993 [1993/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Howa Co., Ltd.
418, Aza Kawaharabata, Inadera
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
HOWA CO., LTD.
418, Aza Kawaharabata, Inadera
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ANDO, Kazuaki
418, Aza Kawaharabata Inadera, Amagasaki-shi
Hyogo 661 / JP
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Lynd, Michael Arthur, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]Lynd, Michael Arthur, et al
MARKS & CLERK 57 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date85904860.525.09.1985
[1987/37]
WO1985JP00529
Priority number, dateJP19840180317U27.11.1984         Original published format: JP 18031784 U
JP1985006307326.03.1985         Original published format: JP 6307385
[1987/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8603131
Date:05.06.1986
Language:EN
[1986/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235290
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1987/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0235290
Date:25.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.06.1986
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1988
ClassificationIPC:A62C3/06, E06B7/18, E06B7/16
[1992/13]
CPC:
E05F1/006 (EP,US); A62C2/06 (KR); A62C2/18 (EP,US);
E06B3/4645 (EP,US); E06B5/16 (EP,US); E06B5/164 (EP,US);
E06B7/16 (EP,US); E06B7/18 (EP,KR,US); E05Y2800/25 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/134 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1987/37]A62C3/14, E06B7/18, E06B7/16
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [1987/37]
TitleGerman:WASSERDICHTE STRUKTUR FÜR SELBSTSCHLIESSENDE TÜREN[1987/37]
English:SELF-CLOSING DOOR SEALING STRUCTURE[1987/37]
French:STRUCTURE ETANCHE POUR PORTES A FERMETURE AUTOMATIQUE[1987/37]
Entry into regional phase25.05.1987Translation filed 
26.05.1987National basic fee paid 
26.05.1987Search fee paid 
26.05.1987Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.1986Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB
26.05.1987Examination requested  [1987/37]
18.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.1991Fee for grant paid
24.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.12.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
09.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2704460  (IPU LTD);
 [A]US3027937  (WILSON FOSTER M);
 [A]FR2294300  (FICHET BAUCHE [FR]);
 [A]FR2087719  (GURRI ETS)
International search[A]JPS52122542U  ;
 [A]JPS52126643U  ;
 [A]JPS5853906Y
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.