Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0201606

EP0201606 - INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE CAPABLE OF MONITORING MOLDING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.11.1995
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/47]For all designated states
FANUC LTD.
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KIYA, Nobuyuki 13-106, Yokokawacho Jutaku, 108
Yokokawa-cho, Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 193 / JP
02 / NEKO, Noriaki
3-27, Tamadaira Hino-shi
Tokyo 191 / JP
[1986/47]
Representative(s)Billington, Lawrence Emlyn , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/47]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn , et al
HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date85905670.708.11.1985
[1986/47]
WO1985JP00623
Priority number, dateJP1984023525609.11.1984         Original published format: JP 23525684
[1986/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8602879
Date:22.05.1986
Language:EN
[1986/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0201606
Date:20.11.1986
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1986
[1986/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0201606
Date:09.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.05.1986
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.1988
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/76
[1986/47]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1986/47]
TitleGerman:EINSPRITZGIESSMASCHINE MIT REGELUNG DES VERFAHRENSABLAUFS[1986/47]
English:INJECTION MOLDING MACHINE CAPABLE OF MONITORING MOLDING PROCESS[1986/47]
French:MACHINE DE MOULAGE A INJECTION POUVANT CONTROLER LE PROCESSUS DE MOULAGE[1986/47]
Entry into regional phase09.07.1986Translation filed 
28.07.1986National basic fee paid 
28.07.1986Search fee paid 
28.07.1986Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.1986Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.1986Examination requested  [1986/47]
13.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.1990Fee for grant paid
08.01.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.02.1991  03.04.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Battenfeld GmbH
Scherl 10 Postfach 1164/1165
D-58527 Meinerzhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Müller, Gerd
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1991/14]
Opponent(s)01  09.02.1991  03.04.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Battenfeld GmbH
Scherl 10 Postfach 1164/1165
D-58527 Meinerzhagen / DE
Opponent's representative
Müller, Gerd
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
D-57072 Siegen / DE
27.02.1991No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
21.03.1991No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
08.04.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.08.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07)
19.10.1992Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.09.1995Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.10.1995Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/52]
Appeal following opposition12.04.1994Appeal received No.  T0343/94
13.07.1994Statement of grounds filed
19.09.1995Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
19.09.1995Date of oral proceedings
27.09.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
01.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.07.1993
CH30.11.1994
LI30.11.1994
[1995/36]
Former [1994/24]FR30.07.1993
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2615445  (WESTFAELISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE);
 [Y]DE3407040  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD [JP])
 [A]  - PLAST-VERARBEITER, vol. 32, no. 9, September 1981, pages 1186-1190, Speyer/Rhein, DE; J. CONRAD: "Anwenden von Mikroprozessoren beim Spritzgiessen"
International search[A]JPS4718955  ;
 [A]JPS5559940  (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD);
 [A]JPS57212041  (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD)