Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0201606 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0201606



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 419
06.11.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
30.10.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.10.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.09.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.09.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.09.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
19.09.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
13.09.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.09.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.08.1995 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.08.1995 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
03.08.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
25.07.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
25.07.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
09.03.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
27.02.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.02.1995 Note on telephone consultation Appeal 1
20.02.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.02.1995 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.02.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
16.02.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.02.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.02.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.02.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
13.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
17.01.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
11.01.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.07.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.07.1994 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.07.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
13.07.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
28.04.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.04.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.04.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.04.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.04.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.04.1994 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.03.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.03.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.03.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
07.03.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
07.03.1994 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
07.03.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
07.03.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
07.03.1994 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
21.02.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
16.07.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.07.1993 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.05.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.05.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
24.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.04.1993 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.04.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.04.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
25.08.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.08.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.06.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.06.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.02.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.02.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
23.08.1991 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.08.1991 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 5
08.04.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.04.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.03.1991 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
21.03.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.02.1991 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
18.02.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.02.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.02.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.02.1991 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
09.02.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
09.02.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.05.1990 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.03.1990 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.01.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.01.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
09.11.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
28.10.1989 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.08.1989 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.08.1989 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
26.07.1989 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
13.06.1989 Annex Search / examination 5
13.06.1989 Claims Search / examination 4
13.06.1989 Claims Search / examination 4
13.06.1989 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.06.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.02.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.05.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.03.1988 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.01.1988 European search report Search / examination 3
06.10.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.09.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.08.1986 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 2
08.08.1986 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 2
09.07.1986 Annex Search / examination 2
09.07.1986 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
09.07.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.07.1986 Priority document Search / examination 24
09.07.1986 Priority document Search / examination 23
09.07.1986 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
09.07.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 22
27.05.1986 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.05.1986 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.05.1986 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22
04.03.1986 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.12.1985 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
03.12.1985 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
03.12.1985 Priority document Search / examination 25