Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0235307

EP0235307 - Method for waterproofing treatment of leather [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.09.1988
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fa. YOSHINAGA PRINCE CO., LTD.
4-4, Yanagibashi 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hirai, Yoji
1250, Hasunuma Ohmiya-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
Fa. YOSHINAGA PRINCE CO., LTD.
4-4, Yanagibashi 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hirai, Yoji
1250, Hasunuma
Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirai, Yoji
1250, Hasunuma
Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Sumi, Hirozumi
9-7, Yatsushiromiyamaecho
Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Twelmeier, Ulrich , et al
Patentanwälte Bauer Hubbuch, Twelmeier Zerrennerstrasse 23-25
75172 Pforzheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Rudolf Bauer Dipl.-Ing.Helmut Hubbuch, Dipl.Phys. Ulrich Twelmeier Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31
D-75172 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date86100048.703.01.1986
[1987/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235307
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:C14C9/00, C14C9/02
[1987/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur wasserdichtmachenden Behandlung von Leder[1987/37]
English:Method for waterproofing treatment of leather[1987/37]
French:Procédé d'imperméabilisation du cuir[1987/37]
File destroyed:18.08.1994
Examination procedure10.03.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/44]
06.06.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.03.1988M02   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1800244  (ROEHM & HAAS GMBH CHEM FAB);
 [A]DE2119083  ;
 [A]EP0107948  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]);
 [A]GB1123829  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG);
 [A]SU679626
 [A]  - SOVIET INVETIONS ILLUSTRATED, week C40, 12th November 1980, abstract no. 70862, D18, Section ChemicalDerwent Publications Ltd.; SU - A - 715 625 (MOSC. LIGHT IND. TECH.) 16-06-1978
 [A]  - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, week C16, 28th May 1980, abstract no. 28645, D18E17, Section ChemicalDerwent Publications Ltd.; & SU - A - 679 626 (VOLGA DON. CHEM. WKS.)09-03-1977