blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0191306

EP0191306 - Ballistic-resistant composite article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Former [1994/46]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Former [1991/43]For all designated states
ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation)
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US
Former [1986/34]For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.)
Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Harpell, Gary Allan
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
02 / Palley, Igor
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
03 / Kavesh, Sheldon
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
04 / Prevorsek, Dusan Ciril
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[1986/34]
Representative(s)Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1996/04]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6RR / GB
Former [1986/34]Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date86100407.514.01.1986
[1986/34]
Priority number, dateUS1985069104814.01.1985         Original published format: US 691048
[1986/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0191306
Date:20.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0191306
Date:24.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0191306
Date:18.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0191306
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1988
ClassificationIPC:F41H1/02, C08J5/04
[1988/33]
CPC:
B32B5/28 (EP,US); B32B5/26 (US); C08J5/046 (EP,US);
C08J5/246 (EP,US); F41H5/0485 (EP,US); B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US); B32B2262/0253 (US); B32B2262/0269 (US);
C08J2353/00 (EP,US); C08J2353/02 (EP,US); Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10S428/911 (EP,US); Y10T428/24124 (EP,US); Y10T442/2623 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1986/34]F41H1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1986/34]
TitleGerman:Ballistisch widerstandsfähiges zusammengesetztes Erzeugnis[1986/34]
English:Ballistic-resistant composite article[1986/34]
French:Produit composé à résistance balistique[1986/34]
Examination procedure24.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/17]
10.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.08.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1991Fee for grant paid
17.09.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.12.1992  04.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
ACORDIS AG
Kasinostrasse 19-21
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Heyn, Heliane
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/43]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.1992  04.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
ACORDIS AG
Kasinostrasse 19-21
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Heyn, Heliane
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Former [1999/40]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.1992  04.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Faser AG
Kasinostrasse 19 - 21
D-42097 Wuppertal / DE
Opponent's representative
Heyn, Heliane
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Former [1994/41]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.1992  04.01.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Faser AG
Kasinostrasse 19 - 21
D-42103 Wuppertal / DE
Former [1993/05]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.1992   
Akzo Faser AG
Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49
D-42097 Wuppertal / DE
25.01.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.08.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.08.1993Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
20.10.1993Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08)
15.02.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
10.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.11.1999Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2000Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.03.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
10.07.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.11.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.12.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.01.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition03.05.2000Appeal received No.  T0523/00
30.06.2000Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2002Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS3900625  [ ] (CHEN WEI-GWO);
 DE2817079  [ ] (VALLCORBA TURA);
 DE2803726  [ ] (COMBI GEB ALESSI MARISA);
 US4200677  [ ] (BOTTINI EMILIO [IT], et al);
 DE2943964  [ ] (TECHNOCHEMIE GMBH [DE]);
 DE3218868  [ ] (INDUSTRIAL RES BV [NL]);
 GB2124887  [ ] (PERSONNEL ARMOURED DESIGNS LIM)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.