Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0191306 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0191306



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1426
24.02.2003 Communication concerning request for file inspection Search / examination 1
13.02.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.02.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.02.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
10.01.2003 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
07.01.2003 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
07.01.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
07.01.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.12.2002 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
11.12.2002 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
11.12.2002 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
11.12.2002 Text intended for grant Opposition 19
03.12.2002 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
29.11.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.11.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
25.07.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
10.07.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 26
10.07.2002 Description Appeal 8
10.07.2002 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
10.07.2002 Non-scannable object Appeal 3
03.06.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
03.06.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
17.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.05.2002 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
13.05.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 10
13.05.2002 Claims Appeal 1
13.05.2002 Claims Appeal 1
13.05.2002 Claims Appeal 1
13.05.2002 Description Appeal 5
13.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.05.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
13.05.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.05.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
10.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
08.05.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.03.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.02.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.02.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
25.02.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.02.2002 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
19.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.01.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
15.11.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.11.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
24.08.2000 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
08.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.08.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.08.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.08.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
18.07.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
14.07.2000 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
14.07.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
14.07.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.07.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.07.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.07.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
30.06.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
05.06.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.05.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.05.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.05.2000 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
04.05.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.05.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
03.05.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.05.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
13.04.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.04.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
08.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
03.03.2000 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
03.03.2000 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
03.03.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
03.03.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
15.11.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
15.11.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.11.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
08.11.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
05.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.11.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.11.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
02.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
29.10.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 11
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 25
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.09.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
21.09.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
17.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
08.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
07.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
01.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.09.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
24.08.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.08.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.08.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
23.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.1999 Authorisation Opposition 1
02.08.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.07.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.07.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.07.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
06.07.1999 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.07.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
06.07.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
10.03.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.03.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.03.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.11.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.07.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.05.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.05.1996 Claims Opposition 2
20.05.1996 Claims Opposition 1
20.05.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.05.1996 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.05.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
16.05.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
15.03.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.03.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.12.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
08.12.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.12.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.11.1995 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
10.11.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
10.11.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
05.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.08.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
25.08.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
27.02.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.02.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.02.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
15.02.1995 Description Opposition 2
15.02.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
15.02.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.01.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.01.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.12.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1994 Request for documents Opposition 1
23.11.1994 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
21.11.1994 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
10.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.10.1994 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
23.09.1994 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
20.09.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
14.09.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.09.1994 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 2
05.09.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.09.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.1994 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
23.08.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
23.08.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
23.08.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
09.08.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
09.05.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
09.05.1994 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
28.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.1993 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
31.08.1993 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
23.08.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.08.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
13.08.1993 Request for documents Opposition 1
05.08.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
05.08.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 18
05.08.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
04.08.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
28.05.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.05.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.02.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
25.01.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.01.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.12.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
16.12.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
12.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
31.03.1992 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
07.02.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.11.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.11.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.11.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.11.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.11.1991 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
13.09.1991 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.09.1991 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
10.09.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
02.09.1991 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Search / examination 1
26.08.1991 Request for assignment Search / examination 4
21.08.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
16.08.1991 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
09.08.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.04.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.04.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
25.03.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.03.1991 General enquiry Search / examination 1
13.09.1990 Claims Search / examination 1
13.09.1990 Description Search / examination 1
13.09.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.05.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.02.1989 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
30.08.1988 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 1
01.07.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.07.1988 European search report Search / examination 2
03.12.1987 General enquiry Search / examination 1
04.07.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.03.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.02.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
28.02.1986 Priority document Search / examination 41
25.02.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.02.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.1986 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
07.02.1986 Drawings Search / examination 3
07.02.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.01.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.01.1986 Claims Search / examination 1
14.01.1986 Description Search / examination 32
14.01.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.1986 Drawings Search / examination 1
14.01.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 17
14.01.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11