blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0232438

EP0232438 - Use of xanthine derivatives for host defense mechanism enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.1988
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED
Route 202-206 North Somerville
New Jersey 08876 / US
For all designated states
The University of Connecticut
263 Farmington Avenue, Suite MC 5355
Farmington, CT 06030-5355 / US
For all designated states
Kreutzer, Donald L.
14 Highwood Drive Avon
Connecticut 06001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/34]For all designated states
HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED
Route 202-206 North
Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT
438 Whitney Road Extension
Storrs Connecticut 06268 / US
For all designated states
Kreutzer, Donald L.
14 Highwood Drive
Avon Connecticut 06001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kreutzer, Donald L.
14 Highwood Drive
Avon Connecticut 06001 / US
02 / Novick, William J., jr.
R.D. 2 Bartles Road
Lebanon New Jersey 08833 / US
03 / Sheetz, Michael P.
8 Ridgemoor Drive
Clayton§Missouri 06310 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [1987/34]01 / Kreutzer, Donald L.
14 Highwood Drive
Avon Connecticut 06001 / US
02 / Novick, William J., jr.
R.D. 2 Bartles Road
Lebanon New Jersey 08833 / US
03 / Sheetz, Michael P.
8 Ridgemoor Drive
Clayton Missouri 06310 / US
Representative(s)Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al
Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP
Franklinstrasse 61-63
60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/02]Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr., et al
Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1987/34]Becker, Heinrich Karl Engelbert, Dr.
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Gebäude F 821
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date86100440.615.01.1986
[1987/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0232438
Date:19.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1986
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/52
[1987/34]
CPC:
A61K31/52 (EP,US); A61P37/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/34]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Xanthinderivaten zur Verstärkung des defensiven Mechanismus des Wirts[1987/34]
English:Use of xanthine derivatives for host defense mechanism enhancement[1987/34]
French:Utilisation des dérivés de la xanthine pour renforcement du mécanisme défensif de l'hôte[1987/34]
File destroyed:18.08.1994
Examination procedure20.04.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/41]
17.05.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.02.1988M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.02.198803   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2330742  (ALBERT AG CHEM WERKE);
 [A]DE2335170  (ALBERT AG CHEM WERKE);
 [A]LU71048  ;
 [A]LU71047  ;
 [A]DE2447444  (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM);
 [A]DE2462367  (WUELFING J A FA);
 [A]EP0063827  (NESTLE SA [CH]);
 [A]EP0075850  (HOECHST AG [DE])
 [Y]  - DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, vol. 5, 1985, pages 147-155Alan R. Liss Inc.; D. SEIFFGE et al.: "Effects of propentofylline on the micromechanical properties of red blood cells"
 [Y]  - BR. J. PHARMAC., vol. 72, 1981, pages 723-730, Macmillan Publishers Ltd.; O. HUDLICKA et al.: "The effect of a xanthine derivative, 1-(5'oxohexyl)-3-methyl-7-propylxanthine (HWA 285)on heart performance and regional blood flow in dogs and rabbits"
 [Y]  - ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG, vol. 34(I), no. 3, 1984pages 253-255; U. ELBEN et al.: "Calcium complexes of xanthine derivatives: A new aspect of the mode of action of haemorheologically active drugs"
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 25, 23th June 1986, page 37, abstract no. 218828p, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. KURATSUJI et al.: "Effects of pertoxifylline on polymorphonuclear leukocyte function", & ACTA PAEDIATR. JPN. OVERSEAS ED. 1985, 27(4)547-51
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 17, 28th October 1985, page 26, abstract no. 134498x, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.W. SULLIVAN et al.: "Enhancement of chemotaxis and protection of mice from infection", & TRANS. ASSOC. AM. PHYSICIANS 1984, 97337-45
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 11, 10th September 1984, page 36, abstract no. 83722q, Columbus, Ohio, US; I.R. VAZINA et al.: "Trental correction of disorders of microcirculation and visceral pathomorphology of thermal trauma", & NARUSHENIYA MIKROTSIRK. OZHOGOVOI BOLEZNI 1983, 37-51128-38
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 13, 28th September 1981, page 39, abstract no. 108542d, Columbus, Ohio, US; N.A. ANTELAVA et al.: "Early prophylaxis and treatment of experimental traumatic shock", & IZV. AKAD. NAUK GRUZ. SSR, SER. BIOL. 1981, 7(1)47-52
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.