blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0199892

EP0199892 - Demetallization of heavy oils, heavy petroleum fractions and/or petroleum distillation residues [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.11.1988
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krupp Koppers GmbH
Altendorfer Strasse 120
45143 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/45]For all designated states
Krupp Koppers GmbH
Altendorfer Strasse 120
D-45143 Essen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vollmer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Dahlienhof 13
D-4300 Essen / DE
02 / El-Muzeini, Mohammed Scherief, Dipl.-Ing.
Brieger Strasse 14
D-4030 Ratingen / DE
03 / Preusser, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Lönsberg 24
D-4300 Essen 1 / DE
04 / Coenen, Hubert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Wortbergrode 13
D-4300 Essen / DE
[1986/45]
Application number, filing date86100910.823.01.1986
[1986/45]
Priority number, dateDE1985351569902.05.1985         Original published format: DE 3515699
[1986/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0199892
Date:05.11.1986
Language:DE
[1986/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.1986
ClassificationIPC:C10G21/00
[1986/45]
CPC:
C10G21/003 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1986/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Entmetallisierung von Schwerölen, schweren Erdölfraktionen und/oder Rückständen der Erdöldestillation[1986/45]
English:Demetallization of heavy oils, heavy petroleum fractions and/or petroleum distillation residues[1986/45]
French:Procédé de métallisation d'huiles lourdes, de fractions lourdes de pétrole et/ou de résidus de distillation de pétrole[1986/45]
File destroyed:18.08.1994
Examination procedure02.02.1987Examination requested  [1987/16]
30.12.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1989/03]
10.08.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1989/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.02.198803   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2004035  ;
 [X]US4354922  ;
 [A]US3658695
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.