blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0193004

EP0193004 - Corrosion resistant modified cu-zn alloy for heat exchanger tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.1990
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.07.1990 [1990/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLIN CORPORATION
427 North Shamrock Street East Alton
Illinois 62024 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]For all designated states
Olin Corporation
427 North Shamrock Street
East Alton Illinois 62024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Heine, Murray A.
66 Spring Garden Street
Hamden, Connecticut 06517 / US
02 / Polan, Ned W.
51 Country Way
Madison, Connecticut 06443 / US
[1986/36]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date86101436.304.02.1986
[1986/36]
Priority number, dateUS1985070172614.02.1985         Original published format: US 701726
[1986/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0193004
Date:03.09.1986
Language:EN
[1986/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0193004
Date:19.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.1986
ClassificationIPC:C22C9/04, F28D1/02
[1986/36]
CPC:
C22C9/04 (EP,US); C22C9/06 (KR); Y10S165/905 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1986/36]
TitleGerman:Korrosionsfeste modifizierte Kupfer-Zink-Legierung für Wärmetauscherröhre[1986/36]
English:Corrosion resistant modified cu-zn alloy for heat exchanger tubes[1986/36]
French:Alliage cuivre-zinc modifié résistant à la corrosion et utilisable pour tubes d'échangeur de chaleur[1986/36]
Examination procedure13.08.1986Examination requested  [1986/43]
12.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.01.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.1989Fee for grant paid
13.04.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2123840  (BUNN EDWARD S);
 [A]US2118688  (WEBSTER WILLIAM R);
 [A]US4128418  (VITEK JOHN M);
 [A]FR2065181  (ANDERSSON & CO AB A H);
 [A]DE1287313
Examination   - Metals Handbook, 1948 edition, page 5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.