blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0194585

EP0194585 - Non-return valve in a sprue channel for a foam mould [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.1990
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
kvl Kunststoffverarbeitung GmbH
Luisenstrasse 51
D-6780 Pirmasens / DE
[1986/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Schweikert, Siegfried
Darmstädter Strasse 24
D-6780 Pirmasens / DE
[1986/38]
Representative(s)Weickmann, Heinrich, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/15]Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20
D-81635 München / DE
Former [1986/38]Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte H.Weickmann Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann B.Huber Dr. H.Liska Dr. J.Prechtel Dr. B.Böhm, Möhlstrasse 22, Postfach 860 820
W-8000 München 80 / DE
Application number, filing date86102944.506.03.1986
[1986/38]
Priority number, dateDE1985350795406.03.1985         Original published format: DE 3507954
[1986/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0194585
Date:17.09.1986
Language:DE
[1986/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0194585
Date:25.01.1989
Language:DE
[1989/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.1988
ClassificationIPC:B29C67/22, B29C45/28, // B29K105:04
[1986/38]
CPC:
B29C44/581 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1986/38]
TitleGerman:Anordnung eines Rückschlagventils im Angusskanal einer Schäumform[1986/38]
English:Non-return valve in a sprue channel for a foam mould[1986/38]
French:Clapet antiretour dans un canal d'injection pour un moule de moussage[1986/38]
File destroyed:30.10.1997
Examination procedure26.07.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/11]
18.10.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1990/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.08.1989M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.198904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1948455  ;
 [X]GB1060658  ;
 [A]US3814124
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.