blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0235340

EP0235340 - An anode system for plasma heating usable in a tundish [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.1990 [1990/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel Corporation
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mure, Hiroshi Nippon Steel Corp Hirohata Works
1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Mizoguchi, Ryohei Nippon Steel Corp Hirohata Works
1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
03 / Yokoi, Shinichi Nippon Steel Corp Hirohata Works
1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
04 / Fujihara, Shigeru Nippon Steel Corp Hirohata Works
1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
05 / Ichikawa, Kaoru Nippon Steel Corp Hirohata Works
1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku
Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date86103047.607.03.1986
[1987/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235340
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0235340
Date:11.10.1989
Language:EN
[1989/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:B22D11/10, B22D41/00
[1987/37]
CPC:
B22D11/11 (EP); B22D41/01 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Anodensystem zur Plasmaheizung für ein Zwischengefäss[1987/37]
English:An anode system for plasma heating usable in a tundish[1987/37]
French:Système d'anode pour réchauffage du plasma utilisé dans un panier intermédiaire[1987/37]
Examination procedure03.11.1987Examination requested  [1988/02]
24.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.1989Fee for grant paid
18.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60152610  ;
 [A]JP59163062  ;
 [A]JP58100951  ;
 JP60152610  [ ];
 JP59163062  [ ];
 JP58100951  [ ]
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 317 (C-319)[2040], 12th December 1985; & JP-A-60 152 610 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 10-08-1985, & JP60152610 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 14 (M-352)[1737], 22nd January 1985; & JP-A-59 163 062 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 14-09-1984, & JP59163062 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 203 (M-241)[1348], 8th September 1983; & JP-A-58 100 951 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 15-06-1983, & JP58100951 A 00000000
    [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 317 (C-319)[2040], 12th December 1985; & JP-A-60 152 610 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 10-08-1985, & JP60152610 A 00000000
    [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 14 (M-352)[1737], 22nd January 1985; & JP-A-59 163 062 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 14-09-1984, & JP59163062 A 00000000
    [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 203 (M-241)[1348], 8th September 1983; & JP-A-58 100 951 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 15-06-1983, & JP58100951 A 00000000
ExaminationJP60152610
 JP59163062
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 317 (C-319)[2040], 12th December 1985; & JP-A-60 152 610 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 10-08-1985, & JP60152610 A 00000000
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 14 (M-352)[1737], 22nd January 1985; & JP-A-59 163 062 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 14-09-1984, & JP59163062 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.