blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0199096

EP0199096 - Nitro substituted heteroaryl compounds, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.1990
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.1990 [1990/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway
New Jersey 07065-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]For all designated states
MERCK & CO. INC.
126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000
Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Engelhardt, Edward L.
904 Plymouth Road
Gwynedd Valley, PA 19434 / US
02 / Saari, Walfred S.
1740 Wagon Wheel Lane
Lansdale, PA 19446 / US
[1986/44]
Representative(s)Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al
E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al
c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11
CH-8044 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date86103790.120.03.1986
[1986/44]
Priority number, dateUS1985071688427.03.1985         Original published format: US 716884
[1986/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0199096
Date:29.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0199096
Date:20.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1986
ClassificationIPC:C07D401/04, C07D403/04, A61K31/495, A61K31/55
[1986/44]
CPC:
C07D401/04 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D241/16 (EP,US); C07D403/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1986/44]
TitleGerman:Nitrosubstituierte Heteroarylverbindungen, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen[1986/44]
English:Nitro substituted heteroaryl compounds, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them[1986/44]
French:Composés hétéroaryles substitués par des groupes nitro, leur procédé de préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant[1986/44]
Examination procedure25.04.1987Examination requested  [1987/26]
08.06.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.06.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.06.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.1989Fee for grant paid
03.08.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS3830786  [ ] (FINDEISEN K, et al);
 US4163849  [ ] (LUMMA WILLIAM C JR [US], et al);
 EP0019578  [ ] (CHIMOSA CHIMICA ORGANICA SPA [IT])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 85, no. 1, July 5, 1976, Columbus, Ohio, USA CIGNARELLA, G.; PIRISINO, G.; LORIGA, M. "2,6-Dialkylpiperazines. VII.Synthesis of N4-(2'-pyridyl)-2,6-dimethylpiperazine and separation of its geometrical isomers." page 451, column 1, abstract no. 5590g
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.