Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0198288

EP0198288 - Transformation of plants to introduce closely linked markers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Database last updated on 23.05.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DNA Plant Technology Corporation
6701 San Pablo Avenue
Oakland, California 94608 / US
[1989/50]
Former [1986/43]For all designated states
ADVANCED GENETIC SCIENCES, INC.
6701 San Pablo Avenue
Oakland California 94608 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jorgensen, Richard A.
1129 Oxford Street
Berkeley California 94707 / US
[1986/43]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/43]Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date86104213.326.03.1986
[1986/43]
Priority number, dateUS1985072385716.04.1985         Original published format: US 723857
[1986/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0198288
Date:22.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0198288
Date:17.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/51]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/00, A01H1/00
[1986/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/43]
TitleGerman:Pflanzentransformation zur Einführung von festverknüpften Markierungsmitteln[1986/43]
English:Transformation of plants to introduce closely linked markers[1986/43]
French:Transformation végétale pour l'introduction de marqueurs étroitement liés[1986/43]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure02.06.1987Examination requested  [1987/32]
08.12.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/21]
19.12.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1991/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2464641
 [A]GB2139466
 [A]US3861079
 [A]EP0122791
 [Y]  PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REPORTER, vol. 1, no. 1, 1983, pages 3-8, International Society for Plant Molecular Biology; S.D. TANKSLEY: "Molecular markers in plant breeding"
 [Y]  MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, vol. 183, 1981, pages 209-213, Springer-Verlag, DE; L. OTTEN et al.: "Mendelian transmission of genes introduced into plants by the Ti plasmids of Agrobacterium tumefaciens"
 [AD]  ANN. AMELIOR. PLANTES, vol. 24, no. 1, 1974, pages 77-82; J. PHILOUZE: "Gènes marqueurs liés aux gènes de stérilité mâle ms 32 et ms 35 chez la tomate"
 [AD]  SCIENCE, vol. 227, 8th March 1985, pages 1229-1231; R.B. HORSCH et al.: "A simple and general method for transferring genes into plants"
 [A]  SCIENCE, vol. 223, 14th October 1983, pages 167-169; B.D. ENSLEY et al.: "Expression of Naphthalene oxidation genes in Escherichia coli results in the biosynthesis of indigo"
 [A]  BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 2, June 1984, pages 520-527; G. HELMER et al.: "A new chimeric gene as a marker for plant transformation: The expression of Escherichia coli beta-galactosidase in sunflower and tobacco cells"
 [A]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 9 27th February 1984, page 128, abstract no. 62584k, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. SCHROEDER et al.: "The T-region of Ti plasmids codes for an enzyme synthesizing indole-3-acetic acid", & EUR. J. BIOCHEM. 1984, 138(2), 387-91
 [A]  CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 11, 16th September 1985, page 378, abstract no. 85227x, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.H. MATHEWS et al.: "Regeneration of shoots from Brassica juncea (Linn) Czern and Coss cells transformed by Agrobacterium tumefaciens and expression of nopaline dehydrogenase genes", & PLANT SCI. (LIMERICK, IREL.) 1985, 39(1), 49-54
 [AD]  BARLEY GENETICS NEWSLETTER, vol. 9, 1979, pages 22,23; C.A. FOSTER: "A balanced male sterile-chloroplast mutant scheme for hybrid barley"