blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0199220

EP0199220 - Folding door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.1987
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EFAFLEX Transport- und Lagertechnik GmbH
Fliederstrasse 14
84079 Bruckberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]For all designated states
EFAFLEX Transport- und Lagertechnik GmbH
Fliederstrasse 14
D-84079 Bruckberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rejc, Gabrijel
Mainburger Strasse 28
D-8052 Moosburg / DE
[1986/44]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB
Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
D-85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date86104992.211.04.1986
[1986/44]
Priority number, dateDE1985351363116.04.1985         Original published format: DE 3513631
[1986/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0199220
Date:29.10.1986
Language:DE
[1986/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.1986
ClassificationIPC:E06B3/48, E06B3/80, E05D15/26, E05F15/02
[1986/44]
CPC:
E05D15/264 (EP); E05F15/51 (EP); E06B3/481 (EP);
E06B3/805 (EP); E05Y2900/11 (EP); E05Y2900/132 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/44]
TitleGerman:Falttor[1986/44]
English:Folding door[1986/44]
French:Porte repliable[1986/44]
File destroyed:29.06.1993
Examination procedure30.04.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1987/52]
29.07.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1987/52]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1814224  ;
 [Y]GB878490  ;
 [Y]DE2618179  ;
 [A]EP0092238  ;
 [A]FR797288  ;
 [A]WO8303870
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.