blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0199240

EP0199240 - Prestressable mounting unit with hydraulic damping [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  26.08.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METZELER Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Gneisenaustrasse 15
D-80992 München / DE
[1988/20]
Former [1986/44]For all designated states
METZELER KAUTSCHUK GMBH
Gneisenaustrasse 15
D-8000 München 50 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Andrä, Rainer, Dr.
Dehrner Strasse 19
D-6250 Limburg / DE
02 / Bitschkus, Horst
Kirchhohl 2
D-5416 Hilgert / DE
03 / Hofmann, Manfred
Gerhard von Dietz-Strasse 15
D-6257 Hünfelden / DE
04 / Nelles, Uwe
Alte Bonner Strasse 23
D-5300 Bonn / DE
[1986/44]
Representative(s)Seibert, Hannelore, et al
Seibert Michelis Preissner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/41]Seibert, Hannelore, et al
Seibert Michelis Preissner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1994/28]Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing.
Tattenbachstrasse 9
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1986/44]Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing.
Tattenbachstrasse 9
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date86105098.714.04.1986
[1986/44]
Priority number, dateDE1985351426819.04.1985         Original published format: DE 3514268
DE1986360530519.02.1986         Original published format: DE 3605305
[1986/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0199240
Date:29.10.1986
Language:DE
[1986/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0199240
Date:07.01.1987
Language:DE
[1987/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0199240
Date:19.10.1988
Language:DE
[1988/42]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0199240
Date:12.10.1994
Language:DE
[1994/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.1986
ClassificationIPC:F16F13/00, F16F1/38
[1986/44]
CPC:
F16F13/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1986/44]
TitleGerman:Vorspannbares und hydraulisch gedämpftes Lagerelement[1986/44]
English:Prestressable mounting unit with hydraulic damping[1986/44]
French:Elément de support à amortissement hydraulique pouvant être précontraint[1986/44]
Examination procedure14.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/44]
14.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.04.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.1988Fee for grant paid
21.07.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.07.1989  31.07.1989  ADMISSIBLE
Fichtel & Sachs AG
Bogestrasse 50
D-53783 Eitorf / DE
 [1993/31]
Former [1989/36]
Opponent(s)01  12.07.1989   
BOGE AG
Bogestrassse 50
D-53783 Eitorf / DE
05.10.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.02.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.02.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
26.03.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.1990Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.04.1991Date of oral proceedings
15.05.1991Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.05.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.05.1994Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.05.1994Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.06.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.08.1994Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition10.07.1991Appeal received No.  T0525/91
08.11.1991Statement of grounds filed
19.12.1991Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1991/51]
11.02.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/07]
22.07.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/30]
28.09.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/40]
04.11.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/45]
07.01.1994Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/02]
20.05.1994Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP56143830  ;
 [E]DE3441806  (PHOENIX AG [DE]);
 [AD]GB2010438  (METZELER KAUTSCHUK);
 [A]EP0071698  (WOLF WOCO & CO FRANZ J [DE])
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 26 (M-112)[904], 16. Februar 1982; & JP-A-56 143 830 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE K.K.) 09-11-1981, & JP56143830 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.