blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0205849

EP0205849 - Process for producing L-Threonine by Fermentation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.1992
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.11.1992 [1992/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Katsushige
115-6, Nakanogo Kita Nishiharu-cho
Nishi-kasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 481 / JP
02 / Tsutsui, Hiromi I-305, Toray Narumi Shataku
1-81, Ikegami-dai Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken, 458 / JP
03 / Yotsumoto, Kyousuke
2 Toray Wakakusa Shataku 5, Wakakusa-cho Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken, 457 / JP
04 / Shirai, Makoto
20-7, Yutakadai Misaki-cho
Toyoake-shi Aichi-ken, 470-11 / JP
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner Part mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
D-80469 München / DE
Former [1986/52]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date86106204.006.05.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateJP1985009958913.05.1985         Original published format: JP 9958985
JP1986004258027.02.1986         Original published format: JP 4258086
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0205849
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0205849
Date:23.03.1988
Language:EN
[1988/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0205849
Date:04.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1988
ClassificationIPC:C12P13/08
[1986/52]
CPC:
C12P13/08 (EP,US); Y10S435/822 (EP,US); Y10S435/873 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von L-Threonin durch Fermentation[1986/52]
English:Process for producing L-Threonine by Fermentation[1986/52]
French:Procédé de production de L-thréonine par fermentation[1986/52]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure21.07.1988Examination requested  [1988/37]
20.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.06.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1991Fee for grant paid
27.08.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP48044876  ;
 [YD]US3375173  (SUKEJI NISHIMURA, et al);
 [E]EP0213536  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP])
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 81, no. 4, 19th August 1974, page 310, abstract no. 36502b, Columbus Ohio, US; & JP-A-48 044 876 (AJINOMOTO CO., INC.) 27-12-1973, & JP48044876 A 00000000
 [A]  - AGRICULT. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 38, no. 5, 1974, pages 993-1000; H. KASE et al.: "Mechanism of L-threonine and L-lysine production by analog-resistant mutants of Corynebacterium Glutamicum"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.