blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0205968

EP0205968 - Local area network station connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1993
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Annunziata, Eugene Joseph
7424 Ridgefield Drive, Route 3
Durham, NC 27713 / US
02 / Faress, James Michael, II
105 McCoy Court
Cary, NC 27511 / US
03 / Stammely, Thomas Edward
662 High House Road
Cary, NC 27511 / US
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Lattard, Nicole
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Lattard, Nicole
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
F-06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date86107216.328.05.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateUS1985074936927.06.1985         Original published format: US 749369
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0205968
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0205968
Date:12.10.1988
Language:EN
[1988/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0205968
Date:27.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.1988
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/28
[1993/04]
CPC:
H04L12/42 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1986/52]H04L11/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Stationsanschluss für lokales Netzwerk[1986/52]
English:Local area network station connector[1986/52]
French:Connecteur de station pour un réseau local[1986/52]
Examination procedure22.04.1987Examination requested  [1987/26]
12.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.07.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.1992Fee for grant paid
25.08.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.10.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.01.1993
[2007/52]
Former [1999/42]IT27.01.1993
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4393497  (CANTWELL JR RICHARD F);
 [A]EP0109287  (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO [US]);
 [A]EP0096097  (IBM [US]);
 [AD]US4494185  (GUNDERSON ROBERT O [US], et al)
 [YD]  - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 27, No. 2, July 1984, New York, USA E.J. ANNUNZIATA et al. "Local Area Network Station Connector" pages 952-955
 [A]  - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 25, No. 2, July 1982, New York, USA F. GFELLER et al. "Active Distribution Panels of Connecting Stations to a Ring Communication System" pages 798-800
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.