blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0205980

EP0205980 - Process for the preparation of perylene-3,4,9,10-tetracarboxylic-acid dianhydride [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.1989
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.1989 [1989/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Spietschka, Ernst, Dr.
Am Rödchen 8
D-6270 Idstein / DE
02 / Urban, Manfred
Steigerwaldstrasse 2a
D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
[1986/52]
Application number, filing date86107318.730.05.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateDE1985352080711.06.1985         Original published format: DE 3520807
[1986/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0205980
Date:30.12.1986
Language:DE
[1986/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0205980
Date:28.12.1988
Language:DE
[1988/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1986
ClassificationIPC:C07D311/78
[1986/52]
CPC:
C07C51/54 (EP,US); C07C51/56 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C51/54, C07C63/48 (EP,US);
C07C51/56, C07C63/48 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Perylen-3,4,9,10-tetracarbonsäuredianhydrid[1986/52]
English:Process for the preparation of perylene-3,4,9,10-tetracarboxylic-acid dianhydride[1986/52]
French:Procédé de préparation du dianhydride de l'acide perylène-3,4,9,10-tétracarboxylique[1986/52]
Examination procedure24.01.1987Examination requested  [1987/14]
01.12.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.07.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.1988Fee for grant paid
06.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 76, Nr.11, 13. März 1972, Seite 441, Zusammenfassung 59297z, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. NAGAO et al.: "Decomposition of perylenetetracarboxylic acid diimide in sulfuric acid" & KOGYO KAGAKU ZASSHI 1971, 74(12), 2500-2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.