blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0206344

EP0206344 - Separable bottom-end-stop assembly for separable slide fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K.
No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K.
No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasai, Kazumi
3105-1, Kamikoizumi
Namerikawa-shi Toyama-ken / JP
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
Patentanwalts-PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [1986/52]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7/II Aufg.
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date86108753.426.06.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateJP19850097283U26.06.1985         Original published format: JP 9728385 U
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0206344
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0206344
Date:27.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0206344
Date:11.10.1989
Language:EN
[1989/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1987
ClassificationIPC:A44B19/38
[1986/52]
CPC:
A44B19/38 (EP,US); A44B19/28 (KR); Y10T24/2593 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2595 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Trennbarer unterer Endenschlag für teilbaren Reissverschluss[1986/52]
English:Separable bottom-end-stop assembly for separable slide fastener[1986/52]
French:Butée d'extrémité inférieure pour fermeture à glissière du type séparable[1986/52]
Examination procedure15.04.1988Examination requested  [1988/24]
19.10.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.02.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.1989Fee for grant paid
12.05.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2267079  (CLARK JOHN B);
 [A]US2546649  (MORIN LOUIS H);
 [A]DE2603241  (OPTI PATENT FORSCHUNG FAB);
 [AD]US4221026  (KANZAKA YOSHIHIRO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.