Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0209071 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0209071



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 690
27.10.1998 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
23.04.1998 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
23.04.1998 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
23.04.1998 French translation of claims Opposition 4
30.03.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
24.03.1998 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
13.03.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.02.1998 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
10.02.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 3
10.02.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.1998 Means of redress Opposition 1
10.02.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.01.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
11.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.11.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
31.07.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
31.07.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
26.05.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.05.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.04.1997 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
24.04.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
24.04.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
23.04.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.04.1997 Claims Appeal 1
23.04.1997 Claims Appeal 5
23.04.1997 Claims Appeal 3
23.04.1997 Claims Appeal 8
23.04.1997 Claims Appeal 3
23.04.1997 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
23.04.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.03.1997 Claims Appeal 1
20.03.1997 Claims Appeal 8
20.03.1997 Claims Appeal 3
20.03.1997 Claims Appeal 3
20.03.1997 Claims Appeal 5
20.03.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.01.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.01.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
08.01.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.12.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.12.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.12.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 3
22.08.1996 Claims Appeal 2
22.08.1996 Claims Appeal 8
22.08.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
22.08.1996 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.04.1996 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 1
29.04.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.04.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.06.1992 Claims Appeal 2
05.06.1992 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
05.06.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
13.04.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.04.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.03.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.03.1992 Authorisation Appeal 1
18.03.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.03.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.02.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.01.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
30.01.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
30.01.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 14
30.01.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
30.01.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
19.12.1991 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
17.12.1991 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
16.12.1991 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
16.12.1991 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
10.12.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
10.12.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
10.12.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
10.12.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.12.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.12.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
09.12.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
06.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.11.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.11.1991 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
18.11.1991 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
15.11.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
13.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
30.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
30.10.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
30.10.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.10.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
09.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.10.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 30
21.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
09.09.1991 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.08.1991 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
22.08.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
22.08.1991 Authorisation Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Authorisation Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.08.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.08.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.08.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
12.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
12.08.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
02.08.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.07.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.06.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.06.1991 Authorisation Opposition 1
18.06.1991 General authorisation Opposition 1
18.06.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.04.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.04.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
09.04.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
09.04.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
04.04.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
01.02.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.01.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.12.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.11.1990 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
28.11.1990 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
16.10.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.09.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.09.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.09.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.08.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.08.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.08.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
14.08.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.08.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 11
14.08.1990 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
14.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
10.08.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
29.11.1989 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
06.10.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.07.1989 Drawings Search / examination 2
14.07.1989 English translation of the claims Search / examination 7
14.07.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.07.1989 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
11.05.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 13
08.04.1989 Claims Search / examination 2
08.04.1989 Description Search / examination 9
08.04.1989 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.12.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.12.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
17.11.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
02.11.1988 Description Search / examination 2
02.11.1988 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.07.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.04.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.03.1988 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
08.03.1988 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
29.02.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.11.1987 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.10.1987 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.10.1987 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.09.1987 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
27.01.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.12.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.11.1986 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.11.1986 European search report Search / examination 2
27.08.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.1986 Drawings Search / examination 6
07.08.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.08.1986 Priority document Search / examination 21
07.08.1986 Priority document Search / examination 24
09.07.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 9
09.07.1986 Description Search / examination 21
09.07.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.1986 Drawings Search / examination 2
09.07.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5