Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0209084

EP0209084 - Process for preparing ceramic polycrystalline abrasives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  04.04.1996
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hermes Schleifmittel GmbH & Co.
Luruper Hauptstrasse 106-122
D-22547 Hamburg / DE
[1991/52]
Former [1987/04]For all designated states
Norddeutsche Schleifmittel-Industrie Christiansen & Co. (GmbH & Co.)
Luruper Hauptstrasse 106-122
D-2000 Hamburg 53 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bartels, Gunter, Dipl.-Ing.
Steinburgstrasse 4
D-2057 Reinbek / DE
02 / Becker, Günter, Dr.-Ing.
Ginsterstieg 11
D-2000 Hamburg 56 / DE
03 / Wagner, Eckhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Lornsenstrasse 16
D-2200 Elmshorn / DE
[1987/04]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/04]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date86109453.010.07.1986
[1987/04]
Priority number, dateDE1985352517515.07.1985         Original published format: DE 3525175
[1987/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0209084
Date:21.01.1987
Language:DE
[1987/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0209084
Date:27.09.1989
Language:DE
[1989/39]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0209084
Date:22.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:C09K3/14, B24D3/00
[1987/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/04]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen eines keramischen, polykristallinen Schleifmittels[1987/04]
English:Process for preparing ceramic polycrystalline abrasives[1987/04]
French:Procédé de préparation d'abrasifs polycristallins céramiques[1987/04]
Examination procedure20.07.1987Examination requested  [1987/38]
02.12.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.12.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.1989Fee for grant paid
01.03.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.06.1990  21.08.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
 02  27.06.1990  10.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Norton Company
1 New Bond Street
Worcester, MA 01606 / US
Opponent's representative
Diehl & Partner GbR, et al
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Strasse 9
80636 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/37]
Opponent(s)01  27.06.1990  21.08.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Baillie, Iain Cameron
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
 02  27.06.1990  10.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Norton Company
1 New Bond Street
Worcester, MA 01606 / US
Opponent's representative
Diehl & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Former [1990/34]
Opponent(s)01  27.06.1990  21.08.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Baillie, Iain Cameron
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
 02  27.06.1990  10.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Norton Company
1 New Bond Street Box 15008
Worcester, MA 01615-0008 U.S.A. / US
Opponent's representative
DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65
D-80603 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.08.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.1992Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.06.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.09.1995Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.09.1995Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.01.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.03.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition27.04.1992Appeal received No.  T0406/92
03.07.1992Statement of grounds filed
18.01.1995Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
18.01.1995Date of oral proceedings
30.01.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0024099  ;
 [XPD]EP0152768  ;
 [A]US3454385  (AMERO JOHN J);
 [A]DD76485