Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0209084 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0209084



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 871
04.08.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
22.05.1996 Despatch of the new certificate of a European patent Opposition 1
15.04.1996 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
12.04.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.04.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.04.1996 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
15.03.1996 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
15.03.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
15.03.1996 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.01.1996 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
11.01.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
11.01.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
11.01.1996 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
05.01.1996 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
21.09.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.09.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.09.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.09.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.09.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.09.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.09.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
18.09.1995 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
17.08.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
27.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.07.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
17.07.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.06.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
22.06.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
07.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.04.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.01.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.01.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.01.1995 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.01.1995 Annex to a communication Appeal 1
18.01.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
18.01.1995 Description Appeal 3
18.01.1995 Description Appeal 3
18.01.1995 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
21.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.11.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.07.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
21.06.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.06.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.1994 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.06.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Appeal 1
16.06.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.06.1994 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.06.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.06.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Appeal 1
13.05.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
09.05.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.05.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.05.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.05.1994 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.05.1994 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.05.1994 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.05.1994 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
13.11.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.11.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
24.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.08.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.08.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.08.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.08.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.08.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.08.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.08.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
17.08.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
14.07.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.07.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.07.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.07.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.07.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
03.07.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
01.06.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.06.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.06.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.04.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
29.02.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.02.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.02.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.02.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.02.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.02.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.02.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
26.02.1992 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
26.02.1992 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
26.02.1992 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
26.02.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
26.02.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
26.02.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
29.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
21.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
21.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
21.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
21.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
21.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.11.1991 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
18.11.1991 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 19
14.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
06.11.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.11.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.11.1991 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
04.11.1991 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
21.10.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.10.1991 Request for change of name of the applicant Opposition 2
16.10.1991 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 3
11.10.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
11.10.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
11.10.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.09.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.09.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.09.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.09.1991 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
19.09.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
12.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.09.1991 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.09.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.09.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.09.1991 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
30.08.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.08.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.02.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.02.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
04.01.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.12.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
29.11.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.08.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.08.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.08.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.08.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.07.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.07.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.07.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
02.07.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
02.07.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.1990 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
27.06.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 53
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.1990 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.10.1989 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.08.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.03.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.03.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.03.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.12.1988 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
19.12.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.12.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.12.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
24.11.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.09.1988 Claims Search / examination 3
27.09.1988 Description Search / examination 8
27.09.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.09.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
27.09.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
27.09.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
10.12.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 3
24.10.1986 Refund of (partial) search fee Search / examination 1
17.10.1986 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.10.1986 European search report Search / examination 2
10.07.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.1986 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
10.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 5
10.07.1986 Description Search / examination 16
10.07.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.1986 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.1986 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
10.07.1986 Priority document Search / examination 24
10.07.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11