Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0209907 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0209907



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 491
25.03.1997 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.05.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
29.04.1996 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
04.04.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.02.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.02.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
01.02.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
14.11.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
03.11.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
03.11.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.07.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
03.07.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
19.06.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
26.04.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.04.1995 Description Search / examination 3
26.04.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
28.03.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.02.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.10.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
05.09.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.08.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.05.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 28
31.05.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 2
21.03.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.03.1994 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
28.02.1994 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
15.02.1994 Claims Appeal 3
15.02.1994 Description Appeal 2
15.02.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.11.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.11.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 9
05.11.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
05.11.1993 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 1
03.11.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.10.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
16.09.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.09.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
04.08.1992 Claims Appeal 2
04.08.1992 Claims Appeal 3
04.08.1992 Description Appeal 2
04.08.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
18.05.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.03.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
27.03.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
26.03.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
26.03.1992 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 13
26.11.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.07.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
20.02.1991 Claims Search / examination 2
20.02.1991 Description Search / examination 1
20.02.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 17
20.02.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 23
20.02.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
20.02.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.01.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.12.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.08.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
14.11.1988 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.11.1988 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.09.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.09.1988 European search report Search / examination 2
07.06.1988 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.05.1988 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.04.1987 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.04.1987 Translation of priority document Search / examination 41
17.12.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.09.1986 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.08.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.08.1986 Priority document Search / examination 48
24.07.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.07.1986 Authorisation Search / examination 1
24.07.1986 Authorisation Search / examination 1
24.07.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
24.07.1986 Description Search / examination 27
24.07.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.1986 Drawings Search / examination 16
24.07.1986 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
24.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
24.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 26
24.07.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
24.07.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5