blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0213385

EP0213385 - Laundry washing machine of the top-loading type [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1987/11]Working table top for a laundry washing machine of the top-loading type
[1989/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INDUSTRIE ZANUSSI S.p.A.
Via Giardini Cattaneo 3
I-33170 Pordenone / IT
[1988/02]
Former [1987/11]For all designated states
Zanussi Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3, C.P. 147
I-33170 Pordenone / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Regazzo, Olindo
Via Gasparinetti 5
I-31100 Treviso / IT
[1987/11]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1987/11]Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date86110320.825.07.1986
[1987/11]
Priority number, dateIT1985004573029.07.1985         Original published format: IT 4573085
[1987/11]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0213385
Date:11.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0213385
Date:20.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1986
ClassificationIPC:D06F39/02, D06F39/08
[1987/11]
CPC:
D06F39/028 (EP,US); D06F39/088 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/11]
TitleGerman:Von oben beschickbare Waschmaschine[1989/51]
English:Laundry washing machine of the top-loading type[1989/51]
French:Machine à laver du type à chargement par le haut[1989/51]
Former [1987/11]Arbeitsplatte für eine von oben beschickbare Waschmaschine
Former [1987/11]Working table top for a laundry washing machine of the top-loading type
Former [1987/11]Plan de travail supérieur pour machine à laver du type à chargement par le haut
Examination procedure08.05.1987Examination requested  [1987/28]
14.09.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.06.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.1989Fee for grant paid
26.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU31.07.1990
[1999/52]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2115341  (LICENTIA GMBH);
 [A]DE2134689  (LICENTIA GMBH);
 [A]FR2503744  (ESSWEIN SA [FR]);
 [AD]EP0083532  (ESSWEIN SA [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.