blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0210649

EP0210649 - Light-weight metal piston [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.1990
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.1991Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCAN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Hannoversche Strasse 1
D-37075 Göttingen / DE
[1989/34]
Former [1988/36]For all designated states
ALCAN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Hannoversche Strasse 1, Postfach 37 002
D-37075 Göttingen / DE
Former [1987/06]For all designated states
Alcan Deutschland GmbH
Hannoversche Strasse 1
D-3400 Göttingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Böhm, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Albertus-Magnus-Strasse 11
D-8504 Stein / DE
02 / Zweck, Helmut
Schillingsfürster Strasse 58
D-8500 Nürnberg 60 / DE
[1987/06]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner, et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/06]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date86110453.729.07.1986
[1987/06]
Priority number, dateDE1985352744731.07.1985         Original published format: DE 3527447
[1987/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0210649
Date:04.02.1987
Language:DE
[1987/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0210649
Date:29.04.1987
Language:DE
[1987/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0210649
Date:20.12.1989
Language:DE
[1989/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:F02F3/04
[1987/06]
CPC:
F02F3/08 (EP,US); F02F3/02 (KR); F02F3/045 (EP,US);
F05C2201/0448 (EP,US); F05C2251/042 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/06]
TitleGerman:Kolben aus Leichtmetall[1987/06]
English:Light-weight metal piston[1987/06]
French:Piston en métal léger[1987/06]
Examination procedure10.06.1987Examination requested  [1987/32]
06.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
27.04.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.06.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.1989Fee for grant paid
18.08.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE20.12.1989
NL20.12.1989
SE20.12.1989
AT29.07.1990
GB29.07.1990
CH31.07.1990
LI31.07.1990
[1992/03]
Former [1991/42]BE20.12.1989
NL20.12.1989
SE20.12.1989
GB29.07.1990
CH31.07.1990
LI31.07.1990
Former [1991/41]BE20.12.1989
NL20.12.1989
SE20.12.1989
GB29.07.1990
Former [1991/15]BE20.12.1989
NL20.12.1989
SE20.12.1989
Former [1990/43]NL20.12.1989
SE20.12.1989
Former [1990/34]SE20.12.1989
Documents cited:Search[A]GB407478  (KARL FRIEDRICH WAGNER);
 [A]DE630440  (ELEKTRONMETALL GMBH);
 [A]GB530570  (FRANK HUNTER CLAYTON, et al);
 [A]CH346068  (FONDERIE TECH DE VITRY SUR SEI [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.