blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0213574

EP0213574 - Battery backup installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.1991
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady NY 12345 / US
Former [1987/11]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady New York 12305 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Losapio, Peter Frank
69 Bellamy Road
Dover New Hampshire 03820 / US
02 / Germer, Warren Ralph
Tuttle Lane
Dover New Hampshire 03820 / US
03 / Quellette, Maurice Joseph
Oakwoods Road
North Berwick Maine 03906 / US
04 / Palmer, Ansell Walter
221 High Street
Hampton New Hampshire 03842 / US
[1987/11]
Representative(s)Catherine, Alain, et al
General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet
92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/02]Catherine, Alain, et al
General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet
F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [1988/03]Catherine, Alain
General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet
F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [1987/11]Catherine, Alain
General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet
F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date86111639.022.08.1986
[1987/11]
Priority number, dateUS1985077270105.09.1985         Original published format: US 772701
[1987/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0213574
Date:11.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0213574
Date:04.05.1988
Language:EN
[1988/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.1988
ClassificationIPC:G01R11/02, G01R21/00
[1988/18]
CPC:
G01R11/02 (EP,US); H01M10/48 (KR); Y02E60/10 (EP)
Former IPC [1987/11]G01R21/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1987/11]
TitleGerman:Reserve-Batterie-Anordnung[1987/11]
English:Battery backup installation[1987/11]
French:Arrangement d'une batterie de réserve[1987/11]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure25.10.1988Examination requested  [1988/51]
12.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/38]
23.04.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1991/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4075561  (STEVENS FRANCIS JOSEPH);
 [Y]DE1892670U  (DET STORE NORDISKE TELEGRAF SE [DK]);
 [Y]GB2102169  (GROUP NH LIMITED [GB]);
 [A]GB864935  (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al);
 [AD]US4297635  (STEVENS FRANCIS J)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.