blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0212647

EP0212647 - Cardiotonic phosphodiesterase inhibitors complexed with water soluble vitamins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.07.1991
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC.
3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto
California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/10]For all designated states
SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC.
3401 Hillview Avenue
Palo Alto California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Benjamin, Eric J.
7125 Shady Nelms Drive
Dublin Ohio 43017 / US
02 / Visor, Gary C.
61 Sunrise Court
Half Moon Bay California 94019 / US
[1987/10]
Representative(s)Barz, Peter, et al
Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner
Patentanwälte
Siegfriedstrasse 8
80803 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Barz, Peter, et al
Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8
80803 München / DE
Former [1987/10]Barz, Peter, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8
D-80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date86111663.022.08.1986
[1987/10]
Priority number, dateUS1985076854923.08.1985         Original published format: US 768549
[1987/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0212647
Date:04.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0212647
Date:19.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61K45/06, A61K31/505, A61K31/51, A61K31/44, // (A61K31/51, 31:505, 31:44, 31:375)
[1987/10]
CPC:
A61K31/505 (EP); A61K31/51 (EP); A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); A61P9/04 (EP)
C-Set:
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/51, A61K31/505, A61K31/455, A61K31/44, A61K31/375 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/10]
TitleGerman:Mit wasserlöslichen Vitaminen komplexierte kardiotonische Phosphodiesteraseinhibitoren[1987/10]
English:Cardiotonic phosphodiesterase inhibitors complexed with water soluble vitamins[1987/10]
French:Inhibiteurs de phosphodiestérase cardiotoniques complexés avec des vitamines solubles dans l'eau[1987/10]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure22.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/09]
05.03.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/36]
10.04.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1991/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199005   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0011828  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.