Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0216269

EP0216269 - Decorative panel with improved surface properties [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.1993
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.1993 [1993/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/14]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Van der Hoeven, Johannes Christinus
Graaf Philipsstraat 15
NL-6085 CM Horn / NL
[1987/14]
Application number, filing date86112598.711.09.1986
[1987/14]
Priority number, dateDE1985353373721.09.1985         Original published format: DE 3533737
[1987/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0216269
Date:01.04.1987
Language:DE
[1987/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0216269
Date:21.12.1988
Language:DE
[1988/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0216269
Date:29.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.11.1988
ClassificationInternational:B44C5/04, B32B31/28, B32B27/04, B32B27/42
[1987/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/14]
TitleGerman:Dekorative Platte mit verbesserten Oberflächeneigenschaften[1987/14]
English:Decorative panel with improved surface properties[1987/14]
French:Panneau décoratif ayant des propriétés de surface modifiées[1987/14]
Examination procedure13.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/32]
06.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.1992Fee for grant paid
04.02.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XPD]EP0166153  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [X]DE3010060  (LETRON GMBH & CO [DE]);
 [A]EP0105573  (ENERGY SCIENCES INC [US])