blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0219693

EP0219693 - Method for operating a fluid-atomising ultrasonic atomiser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.1992 [1992/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/18]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Benndorf, Gerald, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Klinikumallee 47
D-8580 Bayreuth / DE
02 / Van der Linden, Klaus
Innerer Ring 40
D-8640 Kronach / DE
[1987/18]
Application number, filing date86112865.017.09.1986
[1987/18]
Priority number, dateDE1985353485330.09.1985         Original published format: DE 3534853
[1987/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0219693
Date:29.04.1987
Language:DE
[1987/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0219693
Date:09.10.1991
Language:DE
[1991/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:B06B1/06, B05B12/00
[1987/18]
CPC:
B05B17/0623 (EP,US); B05B12/08 (EP,US); B05B15/14 (EP);
B05B17/063 (EP,US); B05B17/0669 (EP,US); B06B1/0253 (EP,US);
B06B2201/55 (EP,US); B06B2201/77 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Ultraschallzerstäubers zur Flüssigkeitszerstäubung[1987/18]
English:Method for operating a fluid-atomising ultrasonic atomiser[1987/18]
French:Procédé pour actionner un pulvérisateur à ultrasons afin de pulvériser des fluides[1987/18]
Examination procedure26.08.1987Examination requested  [1987/43]
14.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.04.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.1991Fee for grant paid
26.06.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1240316  (AEROPROJECTS INC);
 [A]US3842340  (BRANDQUIST R);
 [A]FR2421513  (GABORIAUD PAUL [FR]);
 [A]US4275363  (MISHIRO SHOJI, et al);
 [AD]EP0123277  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [AP]US4578650  (WATSON WILLIAM S [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.