blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0226858

EP0226858 - Method for controlling the lift pressure of a pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.03.1995
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WILO GmbH
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
D-44263 Dortmund / DE
[1992/41]
Former [1987/27]For all designated states
WILO-Werk GmbH & Co. Pumpen- und Apparatebau
Nortkirchenstrasse 100
D-44263 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jury, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Burgstrasse 15
D-5790 Brilon-Alme / DE
02 / Hübner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.
Aplerbecker-Mark-Strasse 78
D-4600 Dortmund 41 / DE
[1987/27]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/34]COHAUSZ HASE DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1987/27]Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 02 29
D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date86116410.126.11.1986
[1987/27]
Priority number, dateDE1985354237030.11.1985         Original published format: DE 3542370
[1987/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0226858
Date:01.07.1987
Language:DE
[1987/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.1987
ClassificationIPC:F24D19/10, F04D15/00
[1987/27]
CPC:
F24D19/1012 (EP,US); F04D15/0066 (EP); Y02B30/70 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/27]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Regeln der Förderhöhe einer Pumpe[1987/27]
English:Method for controlling the lift pressure of a pump[1987/27]
French:Méthode de régulation de la hauteur d'eau d'une pompe[1987/27]
Examination procedure03.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/05]
28.07.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
20.05.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.08.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.1991Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/19]
17.03.1995Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/19]
Appeal following examination22.11.1991Appeal received No.  T0234/92
09.03.1992Statement of grounds filed
12.01.1995Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
12.01.1995Date of oral proceedings
20.01.1995Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:20.05.1989Request for further processing filed
20.05.1989Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.06.1989Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
03.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE2946049  [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 EP0091869  [ ] (ELECTRO HYDRAULIQUE SEH [FR]);
 EP0150068  [ ] (RHEINHUETTE VORM BECK & CO [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.