Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0229983

EP0229983 - Sound-deadened grinding wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.1990
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.1990 [1990/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft
Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4
D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[1987/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Padberg, Hans J., Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Hainstrasse 70
D-5300 Bonn / DE
02 / Keuler, Josef
Vinxtweg 4
D-5483 Ramersbach / DE
03 / Brandin, Henning, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Friedrichstrasse 1
D-5340 Bad Honnef / DE
04 / Thormeier, Klaus H., Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Ackerstrasse 37
D-5068 Odenthal 1 / DE
[1987/31]
Application number, filing date86117294.811.12.1986
[1987/31]
Priority number, dateDE1985354530820.12.1985         Original published format: DE 3545308
[1987/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0229983
Date:29.07.1987
Language:DE
[1987/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0229983
Date:09.12.1987
Language:DE
[1987/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0229983
Date:08.11.1989
Language:DE
[1989/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1987
ClassificationInternational:B24D3/34
[1987/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/31]
TitleGerman:Schleifscheibe mit Dämpfung[1987/31]
English:Sound-deadened grinding wheel[1987/31]
French:Meule anti-bruit[1987/31]
Examination procedure19.01.1988Examination requested  [1988/12]
17.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.05.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.1989Fee for grant paid
24.05.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JP57151308  ;
 [YD]AT379100B  (SWAROVSKI TYROLIT SCHLEIF [AT]);
 [Y]AU470172B  ;
 [Y]US3673054  (WRIGHT ARCHIBALD N, et al);
 [Y]US4033805  (MITSUI HISAYASU, et al);
 [AD]FR2318711  (SLIPMATERIAL NAXOS AB [SE]);
 [AD]DE2610580  (RASCHKE HANS DIETER DIPL ING)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 256 (M-179)[1134], 15. Dezember 1982; & JP-A-57 151 308 (SHOWA DENSEN DENRAN K.K.) 18-09-1982, & JP57151308 A 00000000