blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0231489

EP0231489 - Apparatus and method for preventing the formation of a deposit from a processing solution on a film transport member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.1991
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For:DE  GB  IT 
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
For:FR 
KODAK-PATHE
8-26, rue Villiot
F-75580 Paris Cedex 12 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For:DE  GB  IT 
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
For:FR 
KODAK-PATHE
8-26, rue Villiot
F-75580 Paris Cedex 12 / FR
Former [1989/35]For:DE  GB  IT 
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation)
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
For:FR 
KODAK-PATHE
8-26, rue Villiot
F-75580 Paris Cedex 12 / FR
Former [1987/33]For:DE  GB  IT 
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester New York 14650 / US
For:FR 
KODAK-PATHE
8-26, rue Villiot
F-75580 Paris Cedex 12 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Thibault, Jean
Kodak-Pathé Zone Industrielle
F-71102 Châlon-sur-Saone Cédex / FR
[1987/33]
Representative(s)Buff, Michel, et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/33]Buff, Michel, et al
Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle
F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date86117300.311.12.1986
[1987/33]
Priority number, dateFR1985001901623.12.1985         Original published format: FR 8519016
[1987/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0231489
Date:12.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0231489
Date:10.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:G03D3/13
[1987/33]
CPC:
G03D3/132 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/33]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vorbeugung vor Ablagerungsbildung von Entwicklerlösung auf einem Filmtransportteil[1987/33]
English:Apparatus and method for preventing the formation of a deposit from a processing solution on a film transport member[1987/33]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour éviter la formation de dépôts de solutions de développement sur un membre de transport de film[1987/33]
Examination procedure17.01.1988Examination requested  [1988/12]
18.12.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.1990Fee for grant paid
02.07.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.01.1987DE   M02   Fee paid on   16.02.1987
12.01.1987FR   M02   Fee paid on   16.02.1987
12.01.1987GB   M02   Fee paid on   16.02.1987
12.01.1987IT   M02   Fee paid on   16.02.1987
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3270654  (RUSSELL HAROLD D, et al);
 [A]US4174901  (SHINTANI TADASHI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.