blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0234039

EP0234039 - A gas burner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.1990Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.1990 [1990/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vanderman, Zvi
11 Haknesset Street Neve Haim
IE-Hadera / IE
[1987/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/36]
Representative(s)Brown, John D., et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]Brown, John David, et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date86117739.219.12.1986
[1987/36]
Priority number, dateIL1945000077920.02.1986         Original published format: IL 77945
IL1990000078605.05.1986         Original published format: IL 78690
[1987/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0234039
Date:02.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0234039
Date:01.02.1989
Language:EN
[1989/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1988
ClassificationIPC:F24C3/08, F23D14/58
[1987/36]
CPC:
F23D14/04 (EP,US); F23D14/58 (EP,US); F24C3/085 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/36]
TitleGerman:Gasbrenner[1987/36]
English:A gas burner[1987/36]
French:Brûleur à gaz[1987/36]
File destroyed:30.10.1997
Examination procedure02.08.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/12]
25.10.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1990/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.08.1989M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.198903   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.1989
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1127094  ;
 [A]US2836233  (JAN SCHOENMAKERS PIETER, et al);
 [A]FR1055786  ;
 [A]CH230590  (CROZET FRANCOIS WILLIAM [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.