Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0191517

EP0191517 - Implement for milking animals, such as cows [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1986/34]Implement and method for milking animals, such as cows
[1990/48]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  14.06.1996
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. van der Lely N.V.
Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[N/P]
Former [1986/34]For all designated states
C. van der Lely N.V.
Weverskade 10 P.O. Box 26
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van der Lely, Cornelis
7 Bruschenrain
Zug / CH
[1986/34]
Representative(s)Mulder, Herman , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
3155 PD Maasland / NL
[N/P]
Former [1986/34]Mulder, Herman , et al
Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10
NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL
Application number, filing date86200099.922.01.1986
[1986/34]
Priority number, dateNL1985000022428.01.1985         Original published format: NL 8500224
NL1985000022228.01.1985         Original published format: NL 8500222
NL1985000022328.01.1985         Original published format: NL 8500223
[1986/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0191517
Date:20.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0191517
Date:28.11.1990
Language:EN
[1990/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0191517
Date:31.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1986
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/00, A01K1/12
[1986/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/34]
TitleGerman:Gerät zum Melken von Tieren, wie z.B Kühen[1990/48]
English:Implement for milking animals, such as cows[1990/48]
French:Dispositif de traite d'animaux, par exemple des vaches[1990/48]
Former [1986/34]Gerät und Verfahren zum Melken von Tieren, wie z.B Kühen
Former [1986/34]Implement and method for milking animals, such as cows
Former [1986/34]Dispositif et procédé de traite d'animaux, par exemple des vaches
MiscellaneousEPB 1990/48: Teilanmeldung 89103331.8 eingereicht am 22/01/86
EPB 1990/48: Divisional application 89103331.8 filed on 22/01/86
EPB 1990/48: Demande divisionnaire 89103331.8 déposée le 22/01/86
Examination procedure18.02.1987Examination requested  [1987/18]
31.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.1990Fee for grant paid
06.08.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP89103331.8  / EP0323444
EP89103332.6  / EP0322404
EP93200144.9  / EP0541517
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.08.1991  15.10.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion Development B.V.
Kromme Spieringweg 289B
2141 BS Vijfhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
 02  28.08.1991  17.12.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Gascoigne-Melotte B.V.
Gildenweg 2
8304 BC Emmeloord / NL
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1991/43]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.1991  15.10.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Prolion Development B.V.
Kromme Spieringweg 289B
2141 BS Vijfhuizen / NL
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
 02  28.08.1991  17.12.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Gascoigne-Melotte B.V.
Gildenweg 2
8304 BC Emmeloord / NL
Opponent's representative
van Westenbrugge, Andries
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
20.12.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.06.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.01.1996Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.02.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.02.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.05.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition08.07.1993Appeal received No.  T0664/93
27.09.1993Statement of grounds filed
07.08.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/33]
05.10.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/40]
11.01.1996Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
11.01.1996Date of oral proceedings
23.01.1996Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4010714  ;
 [A]US3763828  ;
 [A]EP0091892
 [A]  - DE TELEGRAAF, 4th December 1984, page T23; E. BOS: "Land en tuinbouw"