Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0196121

EP0196121 - Process for obtaining the preparation for the treatment of the disease psoriasis; drug for the treatment of psoriasis and its application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.11.1990
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visnjic, Pera, Dr.
Mose Pijade Str. 3
Makarska / YU
[1987/13]
Former [1986/40]For all designated states
Galenika Pharmaceutical and Chemical Industry
Zemun Batajnicki Drum B.B.
Beograd-Zemun / YU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/13]
Former [1986/40]01 / Visnjic, Pero, Dr.
M. Pijade 3
Makarska / YU
Representative(s)Noz, Franciscus Xaverius , et al
Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1986/40]Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir. , et al
Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645
NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date86200238.318.02.1986
[1986/40]
Priority number, dateYU1986000022114.02.1986         Original published format: YU 22186
[1987/11]
Former [1986/40]YU1986000022114.02.1986
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0196121
Date:01.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1986
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/57, A61K31/58, // (A61K31/58, 31:57, 31:71, 31:60)
[1986/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung des Präparats für die Behandlung der Krankheit Psoriasis; Arzneimittel für die Behandlung von Psoriasis und seine Anwendung[1986/40]
English:Process for obtaining the preparation for the treatment of the disease psoriasis; drug for the treatment of psoriasis and its application[1986/40]
French:Procédé pour obtenir la préparation pour le traitement de la maladie psoriasis; médicament pour le traitement du psoriasis et son applicatioN[1986/40]
Examination procedure25.09.1986Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
21.10.1986Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01
13.03.1987Examination requested  [1987/19]
25.11.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.1990Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1991/02]
16.08.1990Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/02]
Appeal following examination10.12.1990Appeal received No.  T0248/91
23.01.1991Statement of grounds filed
20.06.1991Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
Request for re-establishment of rights:10.12.1990Date of receipt
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
06.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE]
Licencee:Galenika Pharmaceutical and Chemical Industry
Zemun Batajnicki Drum B.B.
Beograd-Zemun / YU
Date:02.02.1987
Former [1987/13]ID:01 00/exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:Galenika Pharmaceutical and Chemical Industry
Zemun Batajnicki Drum B.B.
Beograd-Zemun / YU
Date:
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2116444  ;
 [X]GB2084465  ;
 [A]US3934013
 [X]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, vol. 27, no. 1, January 1975, page 5, Chatham, New Jersey, US.
 [X]  - DICTIONNAIRE VIDAL, 1974, pages 14,33, OVP, Paris, FR.
 [X]  - DICTIONNAIRE VIDAL, 1974, pages 1699-1700, OVP, Paris, FR.
 [X]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, vol. 31, no. 2, February 1979, page 21, Chatham, New Jersey, US.