Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0212692

EP0212692 - Energy storage and recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.1990
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.1990 [1990/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1987/10]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Hölscher, Hugo
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
[1987/10]
Representative(s)Aalbers, Onno , et al
P.O. Box 162
2501 AN Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1987/10]Aalbers, Onno , et al
P.O. Box 162
NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date86201065.918.06.1986
[1987/10]
Priority number, dateNL1985000219406.08.1985         Original published format: NL 8502194
[1987/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0212692
Date:04.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0212692
Date:20.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1986
ClassificationInternational:F03B17/02, F03B13/00
[1987/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1987/10]
TitleGerman:Speicherung und Rückgewinnung von Energie[1987/10]
English:Energy storage and recovery[1987/10]
French:Système de stockage et de récupération d'énergie[1987/10]
Examination procedure13.07.1987Examination requested  [1987/38]
17.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.1989Fee for grant paid
11.09.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2001395  (NORTON J);
 [A]DE2513479  (PERREN BENNO);
 [A]US4086765  (GILLILAN JAMES)