blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0206422

EP0206422 - Electron emission device provided with a reservoir containing material reducing the electron work function [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.1991 [1991/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Zwier, Jan
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / Vasterink, Johannes Hermannus Antonius
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / van Esdonk, Johannes
c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date86201069.119.06.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateNL1985000180624.06.1985         Original published format: NL 8501806
[1986/52]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0206422
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0206422
Date:28.02.1990
Language:EN
[1990/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1986
ClassificationIPC:H01J3/02
[1986/52]
CPC:
H01J1/28 (KR); H01J1/308 (EP,US); H01J1/32 (EP,US);
H01J1/34 (EP,US); H01J3/02 (EP,US); H01J2201/3423 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Anordnung zur Elektronenemission mit einem das Elektronenaustrittspotential verringernden Material enthaltenden Behälter[1986/52]
English:Electron emission device provided with a reservoir containing material reducing the electron work function[1986/52]
French:Dispositif d'émission d'électrons muni d'un réservoir comprenant un matériau réducteur du potentiel de sortie[1986/52]
Examination procedure15.05.1987Examination requested  [1987/29]
24.06.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.09.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.1989Fee for grant paid
04.12.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.11.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.07.198803   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1988
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL28.02.1990
[1990/44]
Documents cited:Search[A]US3806372  (SOMMER A);
 [A]US3630587  (GARBE SIEGFRIED, et al);
 [A]FR1437887  (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE);
 [XPD]FR2566174  (PHILIPS NV [NL])
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 51, no. 6, June 1980, pages 3404-3408, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; H. KAN et al.: "New activation methods for long-life and highly stable GaP-GaAlP heterojunction cold cathodes"
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 56, no. 7, 1st October 1984, pages 2097-2100, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; M. HAGINO et al.: "Optimum partial pressure of cesium over negative electron affinity surface of GaP-Cs"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.