Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0212758 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0212758



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 493
04.06.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.06.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.06.1999 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
30.03.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.03.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.03.1999 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 14
24.03.1999 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
18.03.1999 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
16.03.1999 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
16.03.1999 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
16.03.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.03.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.03.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.02.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
24.02.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.07.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.07.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.07.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.07.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
10.07.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
10.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
03.07.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
02.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.06.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.06.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.05.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.05.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.05.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.05.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
15.04.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.04.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.03.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.10.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
01.10.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.06.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.05.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.12.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
17.10.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.02.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
22.02.1996 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
25.01.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.12.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
14.12.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.12.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
27.10.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.10.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.10.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.10.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.10.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
18.10.1995 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
18.10.1995 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
18.10.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
18.10.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
18.10.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
29.09.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
17.08.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
18.07.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.07.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
12.07.1995 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
07.07.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
22.06.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.06.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.06.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.06.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.06.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
06.06.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
06.06.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.05.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.05.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.05.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.1995 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
02.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
27.02.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
27.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.1995 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.09.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1994 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
29.08.1994 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
14.07.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.07.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.07.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.02.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.02.1994 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.02.1994 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.02.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.02.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.02.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.02.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.02.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
03.02.1994 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 2
01.02.1994 Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) Opposition 2
31.01.1994 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
25.01.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.12.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.12.1993 Request for documents Opposition 1
17.12.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
17.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.12.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
04.02.1993 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.11.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.11.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.11.1992 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.09.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
14.08.1992 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.07.1992 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.06.1992 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
31.10.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
17.09.1991 Claims Search / examination 1
17.09.1991 Description Search / examination 11
17.09.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.09.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
01.08.1991 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.06.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.06.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 4
03.11.1990 Claims Search / examination 2
03.11.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.07.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.12.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
01.12.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.11.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.11.1988 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
04.11.1988 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.09.1988 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.09.1988 Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.09.1988 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.09.1988 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.07.1988 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.05.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.05.1988 European search report Search / examination 2
22.01.1987 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
17.09.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.09.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.08.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.08.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
19.08.1986 Description Search / examination 12
19.08.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.08.1986 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.08.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 36
19.08.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
19.08.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 12
10.08.1986 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1